Rapaport v. Barstool Sports Inc.
Original Case: 1:18-cv-08783
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02080 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 10, 2024 3:50 AM EST |
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Barstool Sports Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Adam Smith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Kevin Clancy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Eric Nathan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
David Portnoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
Michael Rapaport
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
Michael David Productions Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 11:37 AM EDT |
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/12/2022, RECEIVED.[3387799] 22-2080 [Entered: 09/23/2022 02:46 PM] | |
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/14/2022, RECEIVED.[3387805] 22-2080 [Entered: 09/23/2022 02:48 PM] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael David Productions Inc and Michael Rapaport, FILED. [3387810] 22-2080 [Entered: 09/23/2022 02:50 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 29 pgs Case FILED | ||
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3387819] 22-2080 [Entered: 09/23/2022 02:55 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 30 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
25 | 25 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/29/2021, RECEIVED.[3399935] 22-2080 [Entered: 10/13/2022 03:49 PM] |