Schmid v. Quantum Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC
Original Case: 2:22-cv-05117
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02086 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 26, 2022 4:23 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Quantum Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Cindy Schmid, as Proposed Administratrix of the Estate of Bertha Crespi, Deceased
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/26/2022 4:18 AM EDT |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Quantum Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC, FILED. [3388015] 22-2086 [Entered: 09/23/2022 05:24 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry, dated 09/01/2022, RECEIVED.[3388016] 22-2086 [Entered: 09/23/2022 05:26 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Quantum Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15970901, FILED.[3388017] 22-2086 [Entered: 09/23/2022 05:27 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3388018] 22-2086 [Entered: 09/23/2022 05:27 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
6 | 6 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Michael E. Duffy, Esq. for Appellee Cindy Schmid, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3388022] 22-2086 [Entered: 09/23/2022 05:29 PM] |