Labadie v. NU Era Towing and Service, Inc.
Original Case: 1:20-cv-00722
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02064 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 3:26 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
NU Era Towing and Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Faith Labadie
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/04/2023 3:24 AM EST |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Faith Labadie, FILED. [3388238] 22-2064 [Entered: 09/26/2022 10:04 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 15 pgs DISTRICT COURT REPORT and RECOMMENDATION dated 06/14/2022, RECEIVED.[3388243] 22-2064 [Entered: 09/26/2022 10:07 AM] | |
3 | 3 4 pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION and ORDER, dated 08/23/2022, RECEIVED.[3388249] 22-2064 [Entered: 09/26/2022 10:12 AM] | |
4 | 4 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/24/2022, RECEIVED.[3388267] 22-2064 [Entered: 09/26/2022 10:24 AM] | |
5 | 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Faith Labadie, district court receipt # ANYWDC-4681210, FILED.[3388268] 22-2064 [Entered: 09/26/2022 10:25 AM] |