Kruglov v. Karlinsey
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00072
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02089 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 06, 2023 3:32 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Karlinsey, U.S. Customs and Border Protection Agents, in their individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Hernandez, U.S. Customs and Border Protection Agents, in their individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Hannah, U.S. Customs and Border Protection Agents, in their individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Alvarez, U.S. Customs and Border Protection Agents, in their individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Wehde, U.S. Customs and Border Protection Agents, in their individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, U.S. Customs and Border Protection Agents, in their individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe #2, U.S. Customs and Border Protection Agents, in their individual capacities, AKA B
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dmitry Kruglov
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/06/2023 3:31 AM EST |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Dmitry Kruglov, FILED. [3388289] 22-2089 [Entered: 09/26/2022 10:35 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 19 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 6 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/25/2022, RECEIVED.[3388298] 22-2089 [Entered: 09/26/2022 10:41 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3388302] 22-2089 [Entered: 09/26/2022 10:42 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |