Variscite NY One, Inc. v. State of New York et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Gary L Sharpe |
Referred: | Daniel J Stewart |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01013 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 25, 2023 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Christopher Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
New York State Office of Cannabis Management
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Variscite NY One, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
State of New York
Terminated: 01/31/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 06/05 2:37 PM
USCA Case Number 22-3128 for34 Notice of Appeal filed by State of New York. (jel, ) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
64 | 64
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 06/05 2:20 PM
MANDATE of USCA issued on 6/2/2023. as to34 Notice of Appeal filed by State of New York,47 Notice of Appeal, filed by New York State Office of Cannabis Management. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". (khr) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
63 | 63
10
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 06/01 9:37 AM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION/ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 6/1/2023. (jel, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
62 | 62
misc
Settlement Agreement
Wed 05/31 12:46 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL filed by Variscite NY One, Inc.. (Kernkamp, Christian) |