Jones v. Stewart
Original Case: 1:16-cv-02375
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02105 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 30, 2022 3:31 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Sakir Stewart
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Island Def Jam South
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Island Def-Jam Universal
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kareem Aleem
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blackout Entertainment
|
|
Plaintiff
DoeBoy Entertainment
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Rafael Arden Jones, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/30/2022 3:28 AM EST |
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Arden Jones, Sr., FILED. [3389731] 22-2105 [Entered: 09/28/2022 08:48 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER CLOSING CASE, dated 05/16/2017, RECEIVED.[3389747] 22-2105 [Entered: 09/28/2022 09:02 AM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3389749] 22-2105 [Entered: 09/28/2022 09:04 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |