Roland v. Parker Jewish Institute for Health Care & Rehabili
Original Case: 2:22-cv-05091
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02098 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 28, 2022 4:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
ABC Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ABC Partnership
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Parker Jewish Institute for Health Care and Rehabilitation, DBA Parker Jewish Institute for Health Care and Rehab
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Connie Roland, as Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Una Cowell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/28/2022 4:21 AM EDT |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Parker Jewish Institute for Health Care and Rehabilitation, FILED. [3388992] 22-2098 [Entered: 09/27/2022 08:59 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 08/31/2022, RECEIVED.[3389001] 22-2098 [Entered: 09/27/2022 09:09 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Parker Jewish Institute for Health Care and Rehabilitation, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15970658, FILED.[3389003] 22-2098 [Entered: 09/27/2022 09:11 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3389012] 22-2098 [Entered: 09/27/2022 09:15 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |