Diageo North America, Inc. v. W.J. Deutsch & Sons Ltd.
Original Case: 1:17-cv-04259
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02106 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 28, 2022 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
W.J. Deutsch & Sons Ltd., DBA Deutsch Family Wine & Spirits
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Bardstown Barrel Selections LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Diageo North America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/28/2022 4:22 AM EDT |
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bardstown Barrel Selections LLC and W.J. Deutsch & Sons Ltd., FILED. [3389655] 22-2106 [Entered: 09/27/2022 05:08 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 59 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/09/2022, RECEIVED.[3389659] 22-2106 [Entered: 09/27/2022 05:13 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant W.J. Deutsch & Sons Ltd., USCA receipt # ANYSDC-26732969, FILED.[3389661] 22-2106 [Entered: 09/27/2022 05:15 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3389665] 22-2106 [Entered: 09/27/2022 05:17 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 56 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
7 | 7 MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant W.J. Deutsch & Sons Ltd. and Bardstown Barrel Selections LLC, FILED. Service date 09/27/2022 by CM/ECF. [3389705] 22-2106 [Entered: 09/27/2022 11:38 PM] | |
8 | 8 EXHIBITS, volume(s) 1 of 1, on behalf of Appellant Bardstown Barrel Selections LLC and W.J. Deutsch & Sons Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3389707] 22-2106 [Entered: 09/27/2022 11:46 PM] |