Delaware District Court
Judge:Leonard P Stark
Case #: 1:22-mc-00464
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseRegistration of Foreign Judgment
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2022
Re-opened:Aug 02, 2023
Terminated:Oct 12, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, November 13, 2023
27 27 order Oral Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 11/13 11:30 AM
ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear argument on the motion for a writ of attachment (D.I.2 ) and the cross-motion to dismiss (D.I.11 ) on December 14 at 11:00 a.m. in a courtroom to be determined in the J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building in Wilmington, Delaware. Each side (that is, plaintiffs on the one hand, and defendant and intervenor on the other) will be allocated 30 minutes for its argument. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/13/2023. (smg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
26 26 order SO ORDERED Wed 11/08 8:21 AM
SO ORDERED, regarding23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elliot Friedman. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/8/2023. (apk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
25 25 misc Letter Mon 11/06 4:28 PM
Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Garrett B. Moritz regarding Joint Status Report - re 24 Oral Order,,, Set Deadlines,,. (Moritz, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
24 24 order Oral Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 11/01 11:42 AM
ORAL ORDER: In view of the memorandum opinion and order entered today in several judgment creditor actions (see, e.g., Misc. No. 19-79 D.I. 84, 85), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer, and by no later than November 6, 2023, submit a joint status report providing their position(s) as to: (1) what impact, if any, the abovementioned memorandum opinion and order have on ConocoPhillip's pending motion for a writ of attachment (D.I.2 ) and PDVSA's pending cross-motion to dismiss (D.I.11 ); and (2) whether oral argument is still requested, and if so, how much time for oral argument is requested. (Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2023) Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/1/2023. (apk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/25 12:17 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elliot Friedman - filed by ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V., ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V., ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V.. (Moritz, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
22 22 notice Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel Fri 10/20 11:01 PM
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Stephen C. Childs as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Bayliss, A.)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Request for Oral Argument Fri 10/20 3:19 PM
REQUEST for Oral Argument by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. re11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Intervenor Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 10/18 4:33 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Intervenor Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply of Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.'s in Support of its Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
19 19 order Oral Order Wed 10/11 2:55 PM
ORAL ORDER: The Court having docketed a memorandum order today in the Crystallex Action (Misc. No. 17-151-LPS D.I. 738), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) such order shall be fully applicable in the instant action, including with respect to the setting of the Step 5 and Step 7 deadlines as well as the procedures for implementing priority of judgments; (2) any party seeking to become an Additional Judgment Creditor SHALL file on the docket of the Crystallex Action, no later than three (3) business days after entry of this oral order, a summary of the dates of all completed Steps, as outlined in the July 27 Order (docketed at Misc. No. 17-151-LPS D.I. 646 at 3-7), including supporting documentation sufficient to support the partys representations; and (3) each party seeking to become an Additional Judgment Creditor SHALL make further filings on the docket of the Crystallex Action indicating any additional Step completed no later than three (3) business days after the completion of such additional Step, including supporting documentation sufficient to support the partys representations. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/11/2023. (apk)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 10/11 1:57 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sylvi Sareva, Allesandra D. Tyler, Kevin A. Meehan, Juan O. Perla, Aubre Dean, and Joseph D. Pizzurro for Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
18 18 respm Brief - Combined Answering and Reply Fri 10/06 4:29 PM
BRIEF (Combined Answering and Reply) re11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Intervenor Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V., ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V., ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/13/2023. (Moritz, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
17 17 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Fri 09/22 5:07 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias filed by Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/29/2023. (Cannataro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Childs on behalf of Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela (Childs, Stephen)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Fitzpatrick Cannataro on behalf of Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela (Cannataro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by A. Thompson Bayliss on behalf of Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela (Bayliss, A.)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Declaration Fri 09/22 4:57 PM
DECLARATION re12 Opening Brief in Support,, Declaration of Joseph D. Pizzurro in Support of Intervenor Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Intervenor Petroleos De Venezuela, S.A.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Writ of Attachment by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A..(Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
12 12 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Fri 09/22 4:53 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re11 Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Intervenor Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Memorandum of Law in Support of Intervenor Petroleos De Venezuela, S.A.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Writ of Attachment filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/6/2023. (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction Fri 09/22 4:49 PM
Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter Intervenor Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A.'s Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A..(Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 [PROPOSED] ORDER
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
order SO ORDERED Tue 09/19 9:57 AM
SO ORDERED, re10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph D. Pizzurro, Kevin A. Meehan and Juan O. Perla, Aubre G. Dean, Allesandra D. Tyler, and Sylvi Sareva of Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/19/23. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/18 3:09 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph D. Pizzurro, Kevin A. Meehan and Juan O. Perla, Aubre G. Dean, Allesandra D. Tyler, and Sylvi Sareva of Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP - filed by Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
9 9 order SO ORDERED Mon 09/18 2:07 PM
SO ORDERED, regarding D.I.8 Stipulation Regarding Intervention and Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/18/2023. (apk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
8 8 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Thu 09/14 4:50 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Intervention and Briefing Schedule re2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias by ConocoPhillips Company, ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V., ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V., ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V.. (Moritz, Garrett)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/14 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan McDonnell on behalf of Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (McDonnell, Brendan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/14 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Taylor Hirzel, II on behalf of Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (Hirzel, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
utility Remark Wed 08/02 8:57 AM
Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (smg)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/02 10:32 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (due to related cases). Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
5 5 misc Declaration Tue 08/01 11:31 PM
DECLARATION re2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias,3 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Manuel A. Gomez by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V., ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V., ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V..(Moritz, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1 - 4
4 4 misc Declaration Tue 08/01 11:28 PM
DECLARATION re2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias,3 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Marcus J. Green by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V., ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V., ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V..(Moritz, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1 - 10
3 3 16 pgs respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Tue 08/01 11:26 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re2 MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V., ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V., ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2023. (Moritz, Garrett)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs motion Writ Tue 08/01 11:23 PM
MOTION for Writ re: for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias - filed by ConocoPhillips Gulf of Paria B.V., ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V., ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V..(Moritz, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
1 1 2 pgs misccs Registration of Foreign Judgment Thu 10/13 8:21 AM
REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment in Favor of ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V. and Against Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela in the Amount of $8,505,945,292 ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ADEDC-3980969) - filed by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V.(apk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AO 451 Form,
Att: 2 Cover Letter
utility Terminate Case - Misc. or MD Thu 10/13 8:25 AM
CASE CLOSED (apk)
Related: [-]