Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 1:14-cv-03017
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:754 Appointment of Receiver
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2014
Re-opened:Feb 05, 2018
Terminated:Feb 05, 2018
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 3:02 PM EDT
Counter Claimant
ASI Texas, LLC
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Columbus-Morse Properties, LLC
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Michael Connelly
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
EFA Company, LLC
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Gene Eidelman
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Lorain-Leavitt Properties, LLC
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Michigan Educational Facilities, LLC
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Mosaica Education, Inc.
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Warren-Elm Facilities, LLC
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
Tatonka Capital Corporation
Represented By
Graham Howard Stieglitz
Burr & Forman
contact info
Michael L. Hall
Burr & Forman Llp-Al
contact info
Creditor
ADP, LLC
Represented By
John D. Elrod
Greenberg Traurig, Llp - Atl
contact info
Defendant
ASI Texas, LLC
Represented By
Alexa Roberta Ross
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Nathan Lewis Garroway
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Zachman
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Gary Wayne Marsh
Mckenna Long & Aldridge
contact info
James Matthew Brigman
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Columbus-Morse Properties, LLC
Represented By
Alexa Roberta Ross
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Nathan Lewis Garroway
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Zachman
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Gary Wayne Marsh
Mckenna Long & Aldridge
contact info
James Matthew Brigman
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Defendant
EFA Company, LLC
Represented By
Alexa Roberta Ross
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Nathan Lewis Garroway
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Zachman
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Gary Wayne Marsh
Mckenna Long & Aldridge
contact info
James Matthew Brigman
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Lorain-Leavitt Properties, LLC
Represented By
Alexa Roberta Ross
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Nathan Lewis Garroway
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Zachman
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Gary Wayne Marsh
Mckenna Long & Aldridge
contact info
James Matthew Brigman
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Michigan Educational Facilities, LLC
Represented By
Alexa Roberta Ross
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Nathan Lewis Garroway
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Zachman
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Gary Wayne Marsh
Mckenna Long & Aldridge
contact info
James Matthew Brigman
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Mosaica Education, Inc.
a Delaware corporation Gene Eidelman, President Michael Connelly, CEO 3400 Peachtree Rd. Suite 550
Atlanta, GA 30326
Represented By
Alexa Roberta Ross
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Nathan Lewis Garroway
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Zachman
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Gary Wayne Marsh
Mckenna Long & Aldridge
contact info
James Matthew Brigman
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Warren-Elm Facilities, LLC
Represented By
Alexa Roberta Ross
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Nathan Lewis Garroway
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Zachman
Mckenna Long & Aldridge, Llp-Ga Atl
contact info
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Gary Wayne Marsh
Mckenna Long & Aldridge
contact info
James Matthew Brigman
Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, Llc -Atl
contact info
Interested Party
GGG Partners, LLC
Represented By
James Hayden Kepner, Jr.
Scroggins & Williamson, P.C.
contact info
J. Robert Williamson
Scroggins & Williamson
contact info
Interested Party
Spirit Master Funding, II, LLC
Represented By
Michael Hilliard Schroder
Swift, Currie, Mcghee & Hiers, LLP
contact info
Ethan H. Cohen
Ballard Spahr Llp-Atl
contact info
Craig S. Ganz
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Michael Connelly
Lamberth, Cifelli, Ellis & Nason, PA 3343 Peachtree Rd NE #550
Atlanta, GA 30326
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
James Craig Cifelli
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Interested Party
Dawn Eidelman
Lamberth, Cifelli, Ellis & Nason, PA 3343 Peachtree Rd. NE #550
Atlanta, GA 30326
Represented By
James Craig Cifelli
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Interested Party
Gene Eidelman
Lamberth, Cifelli, Ellis & Nason, PA 3343 Peachtree Rd. NE #550
Atlanta, GA 30326
Represented By
William Dale Matthews
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
James Craig Cifelli
Lamberth Cifelli Stokes Ellis & Nason, PA
contact info
Intervenor
CXA CORPORATION
Represented By
Ashley S. Thompson
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
contact info
Intervenor
Columbus Humanites, Arts and Technology Academy, Inc.
Represented By
Dana Brent Miles
Miles Hansford & Tallant, LLC
contact info
Jonathan R. Secrest
Dickinson Wright, Pllc-Oh
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
CXA CORPORATION
Represented By
Ashley S. Thompson
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
contact info
Kevin A. Stine
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, Pc- Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Tatonka Capital Corporation
Represented By
Graham Howard Stieglitz
Burr & Forman
contact info
Michael L. Hall
Burr & Forman Llp-Al
contact info
Receiver
Katie S. Goodman
Represented By
James Hayden Kepner, Jr.
Scroggins & Williamson, P.C.
contact info
J. Robert Williamson
Scroggins & Williamson
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
utility Final Exhibit Disposition Tue 03/26 4:41 PM
Receiver's documentary exhibits198 from the Evidentiary hearing held on May 5, 2015, were destroyed as directed in244 Exhibit Return Notification (mec)
Related: [-]