Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Referred: John Johnston
Case #: 4:22-cv-00101
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2022
Terminated:Jan 25, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 22, 2023 3:22 AM MDT
Petitioner
Sticks AG
Represented By
Christopher Lee Decker
Boone Karlberg, P.C.
contact info
Julie R. Sirrs
Boone Karlberg, P.C.
contact info
Respondent
Natural Specialty Crops Co., ULC


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
9 9 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 04/02 9:50 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re7 Default Judgment,,, Terminate Motions,, by Sticks AG. (Sirrs, Julie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
misc Certification of Judgment Mon 01/30 3:42 PM
CERTIFICATION of Judgment7 per request from Sticks AG. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
7 7 order Judgment - Default ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 01/25 9:51 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Confirming Arbitration Award in favor of Sticks AG against Natural Specialty Crops Co., ULC. Petitioner, Stricks Ag, LLC, a Montana domestic limited liability company, have and recover from NSC judgment confirming arbitration award in the sum of $1,029,018.00, consisting of principal ($793,898.87) and 48 months of accrued interest through December 9, 2022 ($235,119.13) with post-judgment interest continuing to accrue at the rate of 7.250 percent per annum on the unpaid balance thereafter until satisfaction thereof. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/25/2023. (TLO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
6 6 misc Affidavit/Declaration - SDM Thu 01/12 7:55 AM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Natural Specialty Crops Co., ULC by Sticks AG. (Sirrs, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Default Judgment
5 5 motion Default Judgment - SDM Thu 01/12 7:53 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Natural Specialty Crops Co., ULC Julie R. Sirrs appearing for Petitioner Sticks AG (Sirrs, Julie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
4 4 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 12/23 2:46 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Natural Specialty Crops Co., ULC. (MMS)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Entry of Default Fri 12/23 2:20 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Julie R. Sirrs appearing for Petitioner Sticks AG (Sirrs, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Julie Sirrs,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Default - proposed
Monday, November 07, 2022
2 2 service Affidavit of Service Mon 11/07 3:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award served on Alexandra Barlas on 11/7/22, filed by Sticks AG. (Decker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Mon 10/24 10:10 AM
PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against Natural Specialty Crops Co., ULC, filed by Sticks AG. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit - A,
Att: 2 Exhibit - B,
Att: 3 7 pgs Exhibit - C,
Att: 4 6 pgs Exhibit - D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 10/24 10:10 AM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-2957177 (ACC)
Related: [-]