Lewis et al v. Tyson Foods Inc
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Bernard M Jones |
Case #: | 5:22-cv-00918 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Jul 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 22, 2023 4:03 AM CDT |
Defendant
Tyson Foods Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Hisey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regina Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 04/17 9:52 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER : Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 9/20/2024; Dft witness list due 9/20/2024; Pla exhibit list due 9/20/2024; Dft exhibit list due 10/5/2024; Motions in limine due 1/1/2025; Jury instructions due 1/1/2025; Voir dire requests due 1/1/2025; Trial briefs due 1/1/2025; Discovery due by 11/5/2024. Jury Trial set for 2/11/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom 303 before Judge Bernard M. Jones. Motions due by 10/1/2024. Pretrial Report due by 1/1/2025. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 4/17/2024. (dwl) |
|
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings
Wed 04/17 9:48 AM
ORDER ~ Granting42 Defendant's unopposed motion for a 145-day extension of all pending scheduling order deadlines. The Court hereby resets the matter on the February 2025 jury trial docket and extends all pending deadlines as set forth in the amended scheduling order issued forthwith. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 4/17/2024. (dwl) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Extend Deadlines or Hearings
Fri 04/12 4:33 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings in the Courts Scheduling Order (doc. 40) and for continuance of the September trial setting by Tyson Foods Inc. (Madison, Eva) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/11 12:11 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Relief from Local Rule by John Hisey, Regina Lewis.(Vernier, Travis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Fri 09/01 9:40 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER : Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 4/5/2024; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 4/20/2024; Pla witness list due 4/5/2024; Dft witness list due 4/20/2024; Pla exhibit list due 4/20/2024; Dft exhibit list due 5/5/2024; Motions in limine due 8/1/2024; Jury instructions due 8/1/2024; Voir dire requests due 8/1/2024; Trial briefs due 8/1/2024; Discovery due by 6/5/2024., Jury Trial set for 9/10/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Bernard M. Jones., Motions due by 5/1/2024., Pretrial Report due by 8/1/2024. Status/Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2023 is hereby canceled. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/1/2023. (dwl) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Joint Discovery Plan
Mon 08/28 8:50 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs John Hisey, Regina Lewis. (Anderson, Lexis) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Docket
Tue 08/01 4:23 PM
STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET ~ Status/Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2023 10:00 AM in Room #3018 before Judge Bernard M. Jones. Status Report due by 8/28/2023. (dwl) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Mon 07/17 11:01 AM
ORDER ~ Granting36 Motion to Reopen Case. The stay is hereby lifted, and this matter is reopened for further proceedings. The Court will provide further instruction in a subsequent Order. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 7/17/2023. (dwl) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Reopen Case
Mon 07/10 4:26 PM
JOINT MOTION to Reopen Case by John Hisey, Regina Lewis.(Anderson, Lexis) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
order
Administrative Closing Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 04/17 4:26 PM
ORDER ~ Granting31 Defendant's motion to stay proceedings pending the Supreme Court's decision in Groff v. DeJoy, No. 22-174. Proceedings in this case are STAYED pending the Supreme Court's decision in Groff. The parties are directed to file a motion to re-open these proceedings within ten (10) days of the Groff decision. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 4/17/2023. (dwl) |
|
34 | 34
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 04/17 4:18 PM
ORDER ~ Granting30 Defendant's motion alternatively requesting a partial judgment on the pleadings, as more fully set out in the Order. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 4/17/2023. (dwl) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 03/29 10:14 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re30 MOTION to Amend/Correct24 Order on Motion to Dismiss (or Alternatively for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and Brief in Support Thereof) filed by Tyson Foods Inc. (Madison, Eva) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 03/22 10:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Amend/Correct24 Order on Motion to Dismiss (or Alternatively for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and Brief in Support Thereof) filed by John Hisey, Regina Lewis. (Anderson, Lexis) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
10
pgs
motion
Stay Case
Thu 03/09 1:50 PM
MOTION to Stay Case (All Proceedings and Brief in Support Thereof) by Tyson Foods Inc. (Madison, Eva) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 03/01 8:53 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct24 Order on Motion to Dismiss (or Alternatively for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and Brief in Support Thereof) by Tyson Foods Inc. (Madison, Eva) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/24 4:05 PM
ORDER ~ Due to an oversight, the Court STRIKES its Order dated February 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 2/24/2023. (dwl) |
|
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/24 2:40 PM
ORDER ~ Counsel for Defendant have failed to comply with LCvR 83.3(a). Defendant's attorneys shall either acquire local counsel in compliance with LCvR 83.3(a) or seek relief from such, on or before March 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 2/24/2023. (dwl) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer
Thu 02/23 5:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Tyson Foods Inc.(Madison, Eva) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 02/16 11:41 AM
ORDER ~ Granting25 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Defendant shall file its answer on or before February 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 2/16/2023. (dwl) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 02/16 10:56 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Tyson Foods Inc. (Madison, Eva) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 02/02 5:36 PM
ORDER ~ Granting in part and Denying in part17 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, as more fully set out in the Order. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 2/2/2023. (dwl) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 02/01 3:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Tyson Foods Inc.(Madison, Eva) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Lewis EEOC Charge | ||
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 01/18 4:07 PM
ORDER ~ Granting21 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file its reply on or before February 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 1/18/2023. (dwl) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 01/18 1:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Tyson Foods Inc. (Craft, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 01/12 11:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs.(Anderson, Lexis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, December 29, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 12/29 2:17 PM
ORDER ~ Granting18 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss on or before January 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 12/29/2022. (dwl) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 12/28 7:22 PM
FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by John Hisey, Regina Lewis. (Vernier, Travis) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss
Thu 12/08 3:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Tyson Foods Inc.(Madison, Eva) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Hisey EEOC Charge | ||
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 12/06 10:10 AM
ORDER ~ Granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before December 8, 2022. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 12/6/2022. (dwl) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 12/05 2:20 PM
SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (or Otherwise Respond) (Unopposed) by Tyson Foods Inc. (Craft, Jessica) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/21 1:47 PM
ORDER ~ Granting12 and13 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert E. Barnes and Lexis Anderson are hereby admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/21/2022. (dwl) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
Fri 11/18 6:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lexis Anderson Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-4034721 by All Plaintiffs.(Vernier, Travis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 PHV Application of Lexis Anderson | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
Fri 11/18 6:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert E. Barnes Filing fee $ 50, receipt number BOKWDC-4034718 by All Plaintiffs.(Vernier, Travis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 PHV Application of Robert E Barnes | ||
11 | 11
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 11/18 6:23 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Travis J Vernier on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vernier, Travis) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Fri 11/18 3:01 PM
ORDER ~ Granting6 Defendant's Motion for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement. Defendant's counsel Eva C. Madison and Jessica L. Craft may appear without local counsel. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/18/2022. (dwl) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 11/18 2:59 PM
ORDER ~ Granting5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before December 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/18/2022. (dwl) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Disclosure Statement - Corporate
Fri 11/18 1:21 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Tyson Foods Inc . (Madison, Eva) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 11/18 1:19 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica L. Craft on behalf of Tyson Foods Inc (Craft, Jessica) |
|
6 | 6
4
pgs
motion
Order
Fri 11/18 1:02 PM
MOTION for Order (Motion for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement and Brief in Support) by Tyson Foods Inc. (Madison, Eva) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 11/18 1:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (or Otherwise Respond) by Tyson Foods Inc. (Madison, Eva) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 11/18 12:58 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Eva C Madison on behalf of Tyson Foods Inc (Madison, Eva) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 11/01 3:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Lewis, John Hisey. All Defendants. (Vernier, Travis) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 10/24 4:58 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Tyson Foods Inc. (rr) |
|
1 | 1
43
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/24 4:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Tyson Foods Inc filed by Regina Lewis, John Hisey.(rr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - John Hisey_Right to Sue Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Regina Lewis_Right to Sue, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Mon 10/24 5:27 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BOKWDC-4017833. (Vernier, Travis) |