Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 1:22-cv-23507
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2022
Terminated:Jul 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 25, 2023 4:27 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
IRA Financial Group, LLC
Represented By
Michael Bild
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Jason N Goldman
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Barry Antoine Kamar
Meland Budwick, P.A.
contact info
Mark E. Miller
Miller Friel, PLLC
contact info
Sara Z. Moghadam
Miller Friel PLLC
contact info
Aaron P. Davis
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
IRA Financial Trust Company
Represented By
Michael Bild
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Jason N Goldman
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Barry Antoine Kamar
Meland Budwick, P.A.
contact info
Mark E. Miller
Miller Friel, PLLC
contact info
Sara Z. Moghadam
Miller Friel PLLC
contact info
Aaron P. Davis
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Wesco Insurance Company
Represented By
James Miller Kaplan
Kaplan Zeena LLP
contact info
Maria Kimijima
Kaplan Zeena LLP
contact info
Kimberly Sarah Heifferman
Kaplan Zeena LLP
contact info
Defendant
IRA Financial Group, LLC
Represented By
Michael Bild
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Jason N Goldman
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Barry Antoine Kamar
Meland Budwick, P.A.
contact info
Mark E. Miller
Miller Friel, PLLC
contact info
Sara Z. Moghadam
Miller Friel PLLC
contact info
Aaron P. Davis
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
IRA Financial Trust Company
Represented By
Michael Bild
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Jason N Goldman
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Barry Antoine Kamar
Meland Budwick, P.A.
contact info
Mark E. Miller
Miller Friel, PLLC
contact info
Sara Z. Moghadam
Miller Friel PLLC
contact info
Aaron P. Davis
Davis Goldman, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wesco Insurance Company
Represented By
James Miller Kaplan
Kaplan Zeena LLP
contact info
Maria Kimijima
Kaplan Zeena LLP
contact info
Kimberly Sarah Heifferman
Kaplan Zeena LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Thursday, December 05, 2024
66 66 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 12/05 11:01 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING Barry Kamar's65 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove Barry Kamar from the list of Defendants' counsel in this case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/5/2024. (rr01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 28, 2024
65 65 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 11/28 8:23 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for removal from docket and ECF noticing by Barry Kamar for / by IRA Financial Group, LLC, IRA Financial Trust Company. Responses due by 12/12/2024.(Kamar, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility ~Util - Activate Terminated Attorney Thu 11/28 8:22 PM
Attorney Barry Antoine Kamar representing IRA Financial Group, LLC (Defendant) and IRA Financial Trust Company (Defendant) and IRA Financial Trust Company (Counter Claimant); and IRA Financial Group, LLC (Counter Claimant); Activated. (Kamar, Barry)
Related: [-]