Harris Building Solutions, LLC
Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Karen K Specie |
Case #: | 3:22-bk-30621 |
Case Filed: | Nov 02, 2022 |
Creditor Meeting: | Dec 05, 2022 |
Debtor
Harris Building Solutions, LLC
210 S Shore Dr
Miramar Beach, FL 32550-4836 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Mary W. Colon
P.O. Box 14596
Tallahassee, FL 32317 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
Docket last updated: 11/03/2022 12:01 AM EDT |
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 11/02 5:46 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee: $338.00) Filed by Harris Building Solutions, LLC Schedule A/B due 11/16/2022. Schedule C due 11/16/2022. Schedule D due 11/16/2022. Schedule E/F due 11/16/2022. Schedule G due 11/16/2022. Schedule H due 11/16/2022. Schedule I due 11/16/2022. Schedule J due 11/16/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 11/16/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/16/2022. Atty Disclosure Statement due 11/16/2022. Employee Income Record or Statement of No Employee Income Due: 11/16/2022.Form 122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Current Month Income due: 11/16/2022. Ch 7 Means Test Form 122A-1Supp (Exemption) Due: 11/16/2022. (Ford, J.) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Online Payment
Wed 11/02 5:48 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 22-30621 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5039831, amount $ 338.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
AJTA - Ch 7 Business
Wed 11/02 11:46 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 12/5/2022 at 09:40 AM at with Mary Colon by telephone at (866) 832-5204, Access Code 3014948. (ajta) |