Washington Western District Court
Case #: 2:22-cv-01643
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2022
Terminated:Nov 17, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 16, 2022 3:17 PM PST
Defendant
METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a MetLife
Plaintiff
Amanda West
Represented By
Timothy K. Ford
Macdonald Hoague & Bayless
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/01/2022 11:59 PM PST
Thursday, November 17, 2022
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 11/17 4:37 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. Incorrect divisional office selected by filer. Please see 3:22-cv-05891-BHS for all filings in this matter. (RE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/16 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a MetLife Related [+], filed by Amanda West.(Ford, Timothy)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7780370
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet