Washington Western District Court
Judge:Brian A Tsuchida
Case #: 2:22-cv-01650
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Nov 20, 2022 12:17 AM PST
Defendant
Helen B Garrett
Defendant
Philip J Reid
Defendant
State of Washington
Defendant
University of Washington
Plaintiff
Armando Hernandez
1605 6TH ST NE
AUBURN, WA 98002


Docket last updated: 12/01/2022 11:59 PM PST
Friday, November 18, 2022
2 2 misc Letter Fri 11/18 9:39 AM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (JWC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/18 9:37 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Helen B Garrett, Philip J Reid, State of Washington, University of Washington with JURY DEMAND Related [+], filed by Armando Hernandez. (JWC)
Related: [-] ceipt # TAC 3-100
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet