South Carolina District Court
Judge:Timothy M Cain
Case #: 8:22-cv-04192
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause42:247 Personal Injury relating to contraction and death due to COVID-19
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2022
Terminated:Aug 01, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 21, 2023 5:02 AM EDT
Defendant
NHC HealthCare/Greenwood LLC
Represented By
Zachary Bruce Hayden
Richardson Plowden And Robinson (col)
contact info
William Curry McDow
Richardson Plowden And Robinson (col)
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Shearer
Represented By
Zachary Bruce Hayden
Richardson Plowden And Robinson (col)
contact info
William Curry McDow
Richardson Plowden And Robinson (col)
contact info
Plaintiff
Deryl Higdon
Represented By
Theile Branham McVey
John D Kassel Law Firm
contact info
Jamie Rae Rutkoski
Kassel Mcvey
contact info
John Daniel Kassel
John D Kassel Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
22 22 misc Document Mailed Tue 08/01 12:42 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED: Certified copy of20 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, and NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Chastity Copeland, Greenwood County Clerk of Court, 528 Monument Street Rm #114, Greenwood, SC 29646. (kmca)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Document E-Mailed Tue 08/01 12:41 PM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED: certified copy of20 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, and NEF, to Chastity Copeland, Greenwood County Clerk of Court, ccopeland@greenwoodsc.gov. (kmca) Modified on 8/1/2023: to add text (certified, NEF) (kmca). (Additional attachment added on 8/1/2023: #1 forwarded email to Karen Heery, kheery@greenwoodsc.gov, per Ms. Copeland's out of office instructions) (kmca)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Tue 08/01 12:26 PM
ORDER granting 19 Consent Motion to Transfer Case to South Carolina State Court for approval of a settlement. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/1/23. *Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. (kmca) Modified on 8/1/2023: to add clerk's notice. (kmca)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Transfer Case Tue 08/01 10:08 AM
Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to South Carolina State Court by NHC HealthCare/Greenwood LLC, Jacob Shearer. Response to Motion due by 8/15/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hayden, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/27 7:15 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Deryl Higdon. (Kassel, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/21 4:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by NHC HealthCare/Greenwood LLC, Jacob Shearer.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/28/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Hayden, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/16 4:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by NHC HealthCare/Greenwood LLC, Jacob Shearer. (Hayden, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
12 12 respm Response to Motion Do not use if support or object to motion Fri 12/09 4:25 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Deryl Higdon.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/16/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Rutkoski, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
11 11 motion Remand to State Court Wed 12/07 10:29 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Deryl Higdon. Response to Motion due by 12/21/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Rutkoski, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
10 10 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 12/05 2:15 PM
Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Deryl Higdon.(Kassel, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
9 9 motion Dismiss Mon 11/28 12:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by NHC HealthCare/Greenwood LLC, Jacob Shearer. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Hayden, Zachary) Modified on 11/28/2022: to remove duplicate text (Memo in Support) (kmca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
5 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due fourteen (14) days after removal. (kmca)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 11/22 3:30 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by NHC HealthCare/Greenwood LLC, Jacob Shearer.(kmca)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 11/22 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP 24-00991 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10814229), filed by NHC HealthCare/Greenwood LLC, Jacob Shearer.(kmca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing Removal
notice Notice Other Tue 11/22 3:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due fourteen (14) days after removal. (kmca)
Related: [-]