Barshaw et al v. Pilgrim's Corporation et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-01673 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | King County Superior Court, 22-00002-01999-9 SEA |
Last checked: Sunday May 21, 2023 3:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Does 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Pilgrim's Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Wiersma-Barshaw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey M Barshaw
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case
Fri 11/17 12:02 PM
ORDER granting Parties'35 Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal of Action. This matter is dismissed with prejudice and without fees and costs to any party. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Stipulated Motion
Thu 11/16 3:57 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal of Action , filed by Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation. Noting Date 11/16/2023, (Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
order
Minute Order re Settlement Notice (text only)
Thu 09/28 2:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text-only) entered upon the authority of Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. The Court, having been notified of settlement in this matter, hereby STRIKES the 11/13/23 trial date and related dates. Dismissal/Settlement papers due by 11/13/2023. (LC) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
order
RSM Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM)
Tue 08/08 2:13 PM
**REVISED** ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Bench Trial is set for 11/13/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *4 days*. 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/29/2023, Motions in Limine due by 10/16/2023, Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2023, Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/8/2023, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 11/8/2023. (LC) |
|
32 | 32
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/08 10:58 AM
ORDER granting Parties'31 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date. Trial is continued to begin on 11/13/2023, and all partial dates are continued accordingly. A new scheduling order will be issued by the Court. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Continue
Tue 08/08 8:19 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Continue Trial Date , filed by Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation. Noting Date 8/8/2023, (Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Exclude
Mon 07/31 8:53 AM
ORDER denying Defendant's24 Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Jimmy Daruwalla, MD. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 07/17 4:49 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation, TO RESPONSE to24 MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Jimmy Daruwalla, MD (Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Declaration
Mon 07/03 3:23 PM
DECLARATION of Jimmy Daruwalla, MD filed by All Plaintiffs re24 MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Jimmy Daruwalla, MD (Maxwell, Michael) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Declaration
Mon 07/03 2:13 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Maxwell filed by All Plaintiffs re24 MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Jimmy Daruwalla, MD(Maxwell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 07/03 2:05 PM
RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to24 MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Jimmy Daruwalla, MD .(Maxwell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Declaration
Tue 06/20 9:22 PM
DECLARATION of Nicholas C. Larson filed by Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation re24 MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Jimmy Daruwalla, MD(Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B | ||
24 | 24
motion
Exclude
Tue 06/20 9:20 PM
MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Jimmy Daruwalla, MD , filed by Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 7/21/2023, (Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Tue 04/25 8:25 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiffs'15 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Praecipe to Attach Document
Fri 03/03 11:55 AM
PRAECIPE to attach document Christopher Olch CV as Ex E re19 Declaration,20 Declaration,18 Response to Motion by Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation(Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex E | ||
Thursday, March 02, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 03/02 7:01 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey M Barshaw, TO RESPONSE to15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing the Affirmative Defense of Failure to Mitigate (Maxwell, Michael) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Declaration
Mon 02/27 8:59 PM
DECLARATION of Dr. Christopher Olch filed by Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation re15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing the Affirmative Defense of Failure to Mitigate (Larson, Nicholas) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Declaration
Mon 02/27 8:55 PM
DECLARATION of Nicholas C. Larson filed by Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation re15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing the Affirmative Defense of Failure to Mitigate(Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex D | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 02/27 8:48 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants John Does 1-20, Pilgrim's Corporation, to15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing the Affirmative Defense of Failure to Mitigate .(Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Motion Re-Noted
Wed 02/08 2:40 PM
NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED:15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing the Affirmative Defense of Failure to Mitigate . Filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey M Barshaw. Noting Date 3/3/2023, (Maxwell, Michael) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Declaration
Fri 01/27 7:35 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey Barshaw filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey M Barshaw re15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing the Affirmative Defense of Failure to Mitigate (Maxwell, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Fri 01/27 7:33 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing the Affirmative Defense of Failure to Mitigate , filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey M Barshaw. Noting Date 2/24/2023, (Maxwell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Fri 01/27 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Stephanie N Russo; Evelyn E Winters; Teresa A Griffin and Ryan James Roberts for Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation. (Winters, Evelyn) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
RSM Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM)
Tue 01/24 2:32 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES: Bench Trial is set for 9/18/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *4 days*. Joinder of Parties due by 2/21/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/22/2023, Motions due by 4/21/2023, Discovery completed by 5/22/2023, Dispositive motions due by 6/20/2023, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 8/4/2023, Motions in Limine due by 8/21/2023, Pretrial Order due by 9/6/2023, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/13/2023, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 9/13/2023. by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joint Status Report
Mon 01/23 2:49 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: four (4). (Maxwell, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/18 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jayde Logan on behalf of Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation. (Logan, Jayde) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/17 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nicholas C Larson on behalf of Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation. (Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
RSM - Joint Status Report Order (FORM)
Tue 12/13 9:56 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/10/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/17/2023. (LC) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/29 2:01 PM
ORDER re4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephanie N Russo for Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/28 10:40 AM
ORDER re5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Teresa A Griffin for Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
Wed 11/23 12:03 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MJV) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/23 11:20 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Teresa A. Griffin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7789063 (Roberts, Ryan) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/23 11:16 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephanie N. Russo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7789053 (Roberts, Ryan) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 11/23 11:59 AM
Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (MJV) |
||
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Wed 11/23 12:10 PM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Better Meat Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/30/2022. (MJV) |
||
utility
Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/23 2:38 PM
NOTICE - re1 Notice of Removal. The state court documents indicate the dismissal of parties, JBS USA Food Company, County Post Chicken Company and Better Meat Inc. The parties will be removed from the docket and any deadlines relating to those parties are terminated. (CDA) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/22 7:16 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JBS S.A., Corporate Parent JBS USA Food Company for Pilgrim's Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pilgrim's Corporation (Winters, Evelyn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Verification of State Court Records
Tue 11/22 7:12 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Pilgrim's Corporation (Winters, Evelyn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 11/22 5:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22 2-01999 9 SEA; Attorney Evelyn E Winters added to party Pilgrim's Corporation(pty:dft), filed by Pilgrim's Corporation.(Winters, Evelyn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-K to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit State Court Pleadings |