Childers v. Clanton Police Dept. et al(MAG+)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Myron H Thompson |
Referred: | Terry F Moorer |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-00985 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2014 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 11:26 PM CDT |
Defendant
Katrina Caver
|
|
Defendant
Clanton Police Dept.
|
|
Defendant
Daniel Eric Smitherman
|
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Renee Childers
230 South Dakota Ave Apt A-1
Thorsby, AL 35171 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 16, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 04/16 11:50 AM
ORDER of USCA issued as the MANDATE 04/16/2015 as to Notice of Appeal, filed by Leslie Renee Childers, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-10343 C; Motion to amend document filed by Appellant Leslie Renee Childers is DENIED as MOOT; On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Before: ROSENBAUM, JULIE CARNES and JILL PRYOR, Circuit Judges. BY THE COURT: (ydw, ) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
Transcript Information Form
Mon 03/02 4:45 PM
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Leslie Renee Childers with following notation: "No hearing" (ydw, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 24, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 02/24 10:19 AM
[STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD - DUPLICATE COPY OF DOC. #18 ENTERED ON 02/03/2015] USCA Case Number 15-10343 C for Notice of Appeal, filed by Leslie Renee Childers. (ydw, ) Modified on 2/24/2015, TO REFLECT THAT THIS DOKET ENTRY IS STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD AND THE PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO DISREGARD -DUPLICATE OF DOC.#18 (ydw, ) |
|
appeal
Electronic Availability of ROA
Tue 02/24 10:39 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: Notice of Appeal,, Appeal No. 15-10343 C. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (ydw, ) |
||
Thursday, February 19, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/19 4:15 PM
ORDER denying22 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, forthe same reasons expressed in the order entered February 12, 2015 (doc. no. 20), in which the court previously denied leave to appeal in forma pauperis; denying24 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 02/19/2015. (ydw, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 18, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 02/18 11:38 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal,8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS,11 Motion for status report construed as Objection to Report and Recommendations,13 Memorandum Opinion and Order,14 Judgment, Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Report and Recommendations, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re,21 Notice of Appeal.(ydw, ) |
|
Att: 1 APPEAL PACKAGE | ||
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 02/18 12:32 PM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint by Leslie Renee Childers. (djy, ) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/18 11:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Leslie Renee Childers. (ydw, ) |
|
21 | 21
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 02/18 11:22 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Leslie Renee Childers as to13 Memorandum Opinion and Order,14 Judgment, Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Report and Recommendations entered on 11/07/2014. (ydw, ) |
|
Thursday, February 12, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/12 10:53 AM
ORDER denying16 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; and that the appeal in this cause is certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a), as not taken in good faith. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 02/12/2015. (ydw, ) |
|
Thursday, February 05, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Transcript Information Form
Thu 02/05 12:29 PM
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Leslie Renee Childers with following notation: "No hearing" (ydw, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 02/03 10:46 AM
USCA Case Number 15-10343 C for Notice of Appeal, filed by Leslie Renee Childers. (ydw, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 27, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 01/27 3:05 PM
Transmission of Notice,8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS,11 MOTION for status report, construed as Objection to Report and Recommendations,13 Memorandum Opinion and Order,14 Judgment, Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re Notice of Appeal.(ydw) |
|
Att: 1 APPEAL PACKAGE | ||
Tuesday, January 20, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 01/20 2:21 PM
MOTION To Appeal to higher Court by Leslie Renee Childers. (ydw, ) |
|
Friday, November 07, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 JUDGMENT, In accordance with the memorandum opinion enteredthis date, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of thecourt as follows: (1) plf's11 motion for status is construed as objections to the US Magistrate Judge's8 Report and Recommendation; (2) plf's11 objections are overruled; (3) the8 report and recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; (4) this lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice; further ORDERING that costs are taxed against plf for which execution may issue; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/7/14.(djy, ) | |
Att: 1 civil appeals checklist | ||
13 | 13 OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/7/14. (djy, ) | |
Wednesday, October 29, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER granting11 Motion for status report to the extent plf requests the status of this case, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/29/14. (djy, ) | |
Tuesday, October 28, 2014 | ||
No objections filed to8 report and recommendation (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (djy, ) | ||
Friday, October 17, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION for status report by Leslie Renee Childers. (djy, ) | |
Motion for status report construed as OBJECTIONS to8 Report and Recommendations by Leslie Renee Childers. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See Docket Entry11 ). (djy, ) | ||
Wednesday, October 15, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER denying9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/15/14. (djy, ) | |
Tuesday, October 14, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Leslie Renee Childers. (dmn, ) | |
Monday, October 06, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) the plf's claim regarding the def's refusal to charge, arrest, prosecute an individual be DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); (2) The plaintiff's claim regarding a conspiracy to violate her constitutional rights be DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); (3) this case be dismissed prior to service of process in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); Objections to R&R due by 10/21/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/6/14. (djy, ) | |
7 | 7 ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/6/14. (djy, ) | |
Wednesday, October 01, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial mattersas may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/1/2014. (dmn, ) | |
Monday, September 29, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 INFORMATION of the pro se party by Leslie Renee Childers. (djy, ) | |
4 | 4 DECLARATION of the pro se party by Leslie Renee Childers. (djy, ) | |
Thursday, September 25, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Leslie Renee Childers. (djy, ) | |
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leslie Renee Childers.(djy, ) | |
Att: 1 application to proceed | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Katrina Caver, Clanton Police Dept., Daniel Eric Smitherman, filed by Leslie Renee Childers.(djy, ) | |
Att: 1 supporting documents | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leslie Renee Childers. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See Docket Entry1 ). (djy, ) |