Doe 1 v. JP Morgan Chase & Co.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jed S Rakoff |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-10019 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331ra Fed. Question: Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 23, 2023 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
Bradley J. Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
Epstein Victims Compensation Program
|
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
Jordana H. Feldman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 1
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
James Edward Staley
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Terminated: 01/11/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
294 | 294
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 03/19 10:47 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:291 MOTION to Unseal Judicial Records . . Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) |
|
minutes
Evidentiary Hearing
Tue 03/19 10:13 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Sealed Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/19/2024. (Kotowski, Linda) |
||
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
293 | 293
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 03/12 4:50 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:291 MOTION to Unseal Judicial Records . . Document filed by James Edward Staley..(Wohlgemuth, Stephen) |
|
292 | 292
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/12 4:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re:291 MOTION to Unseal Judicial Records . . Document filed by Jane Doe 1..(McCawley, Sigrid) |