Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC v. Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Anello |
Referred: | Mitchell D Dembin |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-02282 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332in Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2015 |
Last checked: Thursday May 07, 2015 10:51 PM PDT |
Defendant
Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, December 31, 2015 | ||
53 | 53
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Thu 12/31 9:43 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Michael M. Anello Rejecting re51 Joint MOTION for Order [Proposed] Order for Dismissal with Prejudice , from Plaintiff Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(h): Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature, A quality control mailer was sent to the attorney of record on 12/25/2015, to withdraw the document and has yet to comply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/31/2015.(vam) (vam) |
|
Att: 1 (12/31/2015) Stricken Document | ||
Monday, December 28, 2015 | ||
52 | 52
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 12/28 2:15 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice50 . The Court Grants the motion and dismisses this action with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/28/2015. (vam) |
|
Thursday, December 24, 2015 | ||
51 | 51
motion
Order
Thu 12/24 1:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Order [Proposed] Order for Dismissal with Prejudice by Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC. (Shih, Candice) |
|
50 | 50
motion
Dismiss
Thu 12/24 1:42 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC. (Shih, Candice) |