Morgan v. Karas Correctional Health et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Christy D Comstock |
Referred: | Christy D Comstock |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-05016 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 03/06 12:04 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on 3/6/2023. (lgd) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/15 3:17 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 15, 2023.(rg) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 02/15 3:13 PM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Christy D. Comstock: Settlement Conference held on 2/15/2023. Associated Cases: 5:21-cv-05114-TLB, 5:21-cv-05124-TLB, 5:21-cv-05153-TLB (Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 210) (rg) |
||
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/13 8:53 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Shelia Bryant, Janet Haney, Kelly Hinely, Robert Karas, Karas Correctional Health, Summit Food Service, LLC and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: 4 , 7 , 11 . (bjb) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Directing Service
Mon 02/13 8:31 AM
ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Shelia Bryant, Janet Haney, Kelly Hinely, Robert Karas, Karas Correctional Health, Summit Food Service, LLC and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on February 13, 2023. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(bjb) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 02/10 2:03 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), filed by Kristopher Morgan,7 Amended Complaint, filed by Kristopher Morgan. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on February 10, 2023. (lgd) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)
Mon 02/06 9:16 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot [ECF No. 8] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Plaintiff has already been granted leave to proceed IFP in this case (ECF No. 3). Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on February 6, 2023. (smg) |
||
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)
Fri 02/03 2:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Kristopher Morgan. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(tg) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/03 2:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), against Sydney Simmons, Chuck Dominguez, Karas Correctional Health, Racheal Young, State of Arkansas, Janet Haney, Summit Foods, Jon Beckham, Theresa Rothe, Shelia Bryant, Washington County, Jeff Molon, Kelly Hinely, Jolana Wilson, Robert Karas, filed by Kristopher Morgan. Related document:1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), filed by Kristopher Morgan.(tg) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order Directing Pleading to be Filed
Wed 01/18 3:50 PM
ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. Amended Complaint due by 2/8/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on January 18, 2023. (lgd) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee
Tue 01/17 3:53 PM
CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing ADC Delta Regional Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $.33; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (lgd) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Tue 01/17 3:44 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Order - PC Complaint 42:1983 - Initial
Tue 01/17 3:36 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to file the in forma pauperis (IFP) application and complaint submitted by the Plaintiff; GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff in the amount of $ 350;. Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on January 17, 2023. (lgd) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)
Tue 01/17 3:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Kristopher Morgan. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(lgd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Referred (42:1983)
Tue 01/17 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Jon Beckham, Shelia Bryant, Chuck Dominguez, Janet Haney, Kelly Hinely, Robert Karas, Karas Correctional Health, Jeff Molon, Theresa Rothe, Sydney Simmons, State of Arkansas, Summit Foods, Washington County, Jolana Wilson, Racheal Young, filed by Kristopher Morgan.(lgd) |