Moore v. Regent
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Terry R Means |
Case #: | 4:14-cv-00802 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 01, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 5:01 PM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Anh H. Regent
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jennifer Moore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anh H. Regent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Moore
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 24, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 03/24 4:25 PM
Order Administratively Closing Case Due to Defendant's Bankruptcy. The case may be reopened, without prejudice, upon the motion of either party, pursuant to any action taken in the related bankruptcy proceeding. The right to reopen this case shall continue until thirty (30) days after the related bankruptcy proceedings are concluded. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 3/24/2015) (mpw) |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Wed 03/18 5:12 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Anh H. Regent. (Jakob, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 03/10 6:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to9 Answer to Counterclaim filed by Anh H. Regent with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Jakob, Henry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order to Enlarge Time | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 03/10 6:01 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry A Jakob on behalf of Anh H. Regent. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jakob, Henry) |
|
Wednesday, February 18, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Wed 02/18 3:11 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Jennifer Moore, Anh H. Regent. (Foley, James) |
|
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Tue 02/17 1:55 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Jennifer Moore. Related document:8 Counterclaim (Foley, James) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) | ||
Tuesday, January 27, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Counterclaim
Tue 01/27 4:49 PM
First COUNTERCLAIM Defendant's Counter-Claim against Jennifer Moore filed by Anh H. Regent |
|
Wednesday, January 21, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Status Report Order
Wed 01/21 2:29 PM
ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN...parties to e-file the jsrpt w/in 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 1/21/2015) (wrb) |
|
Tuesday, January 20, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/20 3:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Anh H. Regent. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. |
|
Friday, October 10, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to Anh H. Regent. (mdf) | |
Thursday, October 02, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jennifer Moore. (Foley, James) | |
Wednesday, October 01, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb) | |
2 | 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Jennifer Moore. (wrb) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Anh H. Regent filed by Jennifer Moore. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number FW022764) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb) |