Genesis Global Holdco, LLC
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sean H Lane |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-10063 |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Genesis Global Holdco, LLC
250 Park Ave S Fl 5
New York, NY 10003-1402 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004 |
1. | Genesis Files for Bankruptcy, Has $150 Million In the Bank (decrypt.co) |
Submitted Fri 01/20/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
1596 | 1596
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 04/18 5:56 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nataly Diaz Regarding Notice of Disposition of GBTC Shares and Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Twenty-Fifth Omnibus Objection (Non-Substantive) to Certain Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3007 (No Liability) Solely with Respect to Claim No. 1451 filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC Claims Agent.(Steele, Benjamin) |
|
1595 | 1595
notice
Notice, Appointing Creditors Committee
Thu 04/18 3:18 PM
Amended Notice Appointing Creditors Committee filed by Greg M. Zipes on behalf of United States Trustee. (Zipes, Greg) |
|
1594 | 1594
misc
Transcript
Thu 04/18 11:56 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 04/16/2024 At 11:02 AM RE: Motion To Approve Compromise / Debtors Motion For Entry Of An Order Approving A Settlement Agreement Among The Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, The Ad Hoc Group Of Genesis Lenders, And The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors.; Etc. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/17/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/25/2024. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 5/9/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/20/2024. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/17/2024. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
1593 | 1593
motion
Motion, Approve Compromise
Wed 04/17 8:09 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving a Settlement Agreement with GPD Holdings LLC d/b/a Coinflip and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC with hearing to be held on 5/8/2024 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) Responses due by 5/1/2024,. (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
1592 | 1592
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 04/17 5:49 PM
Affidavit of Service of Eladio Perez Regarding Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, and Notice of Filing of Stipulation filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC Claims Agent.(Steele, Benjamin) |
|
1591 | 1591
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 3:15 PM
Order Signed On 4/17/2024, Granting Application For Pro Hac Vice Re: Carolina Y. Sales . (Ebanks, Liza) |
|
1590 | 1590
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Wed 04/17 11:46 AM
Notice of Presentment / Notice of Filing of Stipulation and Order By and Among the Debtors and Soichiro "Michael" Moro filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. with presentment to be held on 4/24/2024 at 04:00 PM at Courtroom (SHL) Objections due by 4/23/2024, (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
1589 | 1589
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Wed 04/17 10:48 AM
Notice of Presentment of the Debtors' Proposed Order Allowing Certain Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 502 [REDACTED] filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. with presentment to be held on 4/24/2024 at 04:00 PM at Courtroom (SHL) Objections due by 4/23/2024, (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1587 | 1587
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Tue 04/16 10:53 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Corrected Notice of Withdrawal of Claim filed by William B. Kerr on behalf of DGR Capital LLC. (Kerr, William) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 04/16 1:28 PM
Receipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)([LINK 23-10063 shl] ) [claims,transclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 61418. Fee amount 28.00. (Bush) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 04/16 2:52 PM
Receipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)([LINK 23-10063 shl] ) [claims,transclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16590014. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 04/16 2:52 PM
Receipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)([LINK 23-10063 shl] ) [claims,transclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16590014. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
1586 | 1586
claims
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)
Mon 04/15 9:13 PM
Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Anonymous To Anonymous filed by Brian Rosen on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders. (Rosen, Brian) |
|
1585 | 1585
claims
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)
Mon 04/15 8:23 PM
Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Anonymous To Anonymous filed by Brian Rosen on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders. (Rosen, Brian) |
|
1584 | 1584
claims
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)
Mon 04/15 7:41 PM
Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Anonymous To Anonymous filed by Brian Rosen on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders. (Rosen, Brian) |
|
1583 | 1583
notice
Notice, Agenda
Mon 04/15 7:21 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda for hearing to be Held April 16, 2024, at 11:00 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. with hearing to be held on 4/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
1582 | 1582
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Mon 04/15 6:36 PM
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Revised Proposed Order Approving Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, the Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
1581 | 1581
notice
Notice, Appearance
Mon 04/15 4:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Katharine Jane Ross on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. (Ross, Katharine) |
|
1580 | 1580
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 04/15 4:05 PM
Affidavit of Service of Ishrat Khan Regarding Fourteenth Monthly Statement of Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Counsel to the Debtors for the Period from February 1, 2024 through February 29, 2024 filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC Claims Agent.(Steele, Benjamin) |
|
1579 | 1579
misc
Monthly Fee Statement
Mon 04/15 3:19 PM
Monthly Fee Statement / Eleventh Monthly Application of Moelis & Company LLC for Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses as Investment Banker to the Debtors from January 1, 2024 Through and Including January 31, 2024 Filed by Jane Vanlare on behalf of Moelis & Company LLC. (Vanlare, Jane) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1578 | 1578
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Fri 04/12 3:42 PM
Notice of Presentment / Notice of Filing of Stipulation and Order By and Between the Debtors and the Holder of Claim No. 55 [REDACTED] filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. with presentment to be held on 4/19/2024 at 04:00 PM at Courtroom (SHL) Objections due by 4/18/2024, (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
1577 | 1577
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Fri 04/12 3:30 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Dina L. Yunker Frank on behalf of Washington State Taxing Agencies. (Yunker Frank, Dina) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice | ||
1576 | 1576
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Fri 04/12 3:11 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed by William B. Kerr on behalf of DGR Capital LLC. (Kerr, William) |
|
1575 | 1575
ans
Declaration
Fri 04/12 2:22 PM
Declaration / Fourth Supplemental Declaration of Jane VanLare in Support of Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP as Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession filed by Jane Vanlare on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. (Vanlare, Jane) |
|
1574 | 1574
notice
Notice, Agenda
Fri 04/12 11:55 AM
Notice of Agenda for Hearing to be Held April 16, 2024, at 11:00 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. with hearing to be held on 4/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
1573 | 1573
order
Motion, Objection to Claim
Fri 04/12 10:48 AM
Order Signed On 4/12/2024, Granting Debtors' Twenty-Second Omnibus Objection To Certain Claims (Non-Substantive) (No Liability And Insufficient Documentation) . (Ebanks, Liza) |
|
1572 | 1572
order
Motion, Objection to Claim
Fri 04/12 10:43 AM
Order Signed On 4/12/2024, Granting Debtors' Twenty-First Omnibus Objection (Non-Substantive) To Certain Claims (Duplicate) (Ebanks, Liza) |
|
1571 | 1571
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Fri 04/12 10:26 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Reservation of Rights Regarding Motion for Approval of Compromise by Debtors, Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders, and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Eric S. Medina, Esq. on behalf of BAO Family Holdings LLC. (Medina, Esq., Eric) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 04/12 3:32 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 23-10063 shl] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16586758. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1588 | 1588
claims
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)
Tue 04/16 4:02 PM
Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: CONFIDENTIAL CREDITOR To CANYON-ASP FUND, L.P. (Fee Amount $28.00, Receipt Number 10001050) filed by CANYON-ASP FUND, LP. (Cappiello, Karen) |
|
1570 | 1570
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 04/11 6:27 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
1569 | 1569
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Thu 04/11 5:31 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection of SOF International, LLC to Notice of Filing of Stipulation and Order By and Between the Debtors and Gemini Trust Company, LLC on Behalf of Gemini Lenders, Allowing the Gemini Master Claim (Claim No. 356) filed by James V. Drew on behalf of SOF International, LLC. (Drew, James) |
|
1568 | 1568
claims
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)
Thu 04/11 4:15 PM
Transfer Agreement FRBP. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: redacted To FTXCREDITOR, LLC filed by Barry R. Kleiner on behalf of FTXCREDITOR, LLC. (Kleiner, Barry) |
|
1567 | 1567
notice
Notice, Appearance
Thu 04/11 12:50 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of All Pleadings filed by Aaron L. Hammer on behalf of Foundry Digital LLC. (Hammer, Aaron) |
|
1566 | 1566
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Thu 04/11 12:00 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of the Debtors' Twenty-Third Omnibus Objection (Non-Substantive) to Certain Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3007 (No Liability) Solely With Respect to Claim No. 353 filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
1565 | 1565
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 04/11 11:38 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Further Adjournment of Debtors' Eighteenth Omnibus Objection (Non-Substantive) to Certain Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 502 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3007 (Co-Liability Contingent) Solely with Respect to Claim Nos. 375, 398, and 408 filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Holdco, LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/8/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom (SHL) (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 04/11 4:23 PM
Receipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)([LINK 23-10063 shl] ) [claims,transclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16585375. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury) |