Dickens v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-01007 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Judgment - Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 08/02 2:16 PM
ORDER ADOPTING15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting15 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $6,779.40 pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 2, 2023.(mll) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 07/17 4:37 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re15 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Bill Dickens. Objections to R&R due by 7/31/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on July 17, 2023.(mll) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Response
Fri 07/14 11:18 AM
RESPONSE by Social Security Administration Commissioner re15 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Wirmani, Tracey) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/10 12:41 PM
CASE REFERRED to Honorable Barry A Bryant. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A Bryant.(tmc) |
||
Sunday, July 09, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Sun 07/09 12:55 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of15 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Bill Dickens. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Attorney Fees
Sun 07/09 12:54 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Bill Dickens.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Itemization, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CPI 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CPI 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CPI 3 | ||
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment - SSA
Fri 06/09 2:29 PM
JUDGMENT REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 9, 2023. (bjb) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment on R&R - SSA
Thu 06/01 10:06 AM
ORDER REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge as set forth in the12 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 1, 2023. (bjb) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 05/24 3:13 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re10 Unopposed MOTION to Remand filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Objections to R&R due by 6/7/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on May 24, 2023. (tg) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Tue 05/23 1:20 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of10 Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Wirmani, Tracey) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Remand
Tue 05/23 1:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(Wirmani, Tracey) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/27 6:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Wirmani on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Wirmani, Tracey) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff)
Tue 04/25 12:02 AM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Bill Dickens.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit DOT 182267010 Skilltran, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Medical evidence abstract | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Social Security Transcript
Thu 03/23 3:41 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Taylor, Candace) |
|
6 | 6
order
Social Security Scheduling Order
Thu 03/23 8:14 AM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 4/24/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 23, 2023. (mfj) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Social Security Transcript
Wed 03/22 9:26 AM
***PLEASE DISREGARD- WILL BE REFILED***SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Taylor, Candace) Modified on 3/22/2023 (lgd) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Thu 02/09 9:58 AM
REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Bill Dickens. (McKinnon, Laura) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
utility
Memo of Reassignment
Tue 02/07 1:33 PM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Susan O. Hickey and referral assigned to Honorable Barry A Bryant.(mll) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Mon 01/23 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 2/6/2023.(lgd) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate consent | ||
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Mon 01/23 9:54 AM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 1/23/2023, answer due 3/24/2023. (lgd) |
||
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/20 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2718302), filed by Bill Dickens.(McKinnon, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 01/20 1:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bill Dickens. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (bjb) |