Akinseye et al v. Bryant
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Case #: | 6:23-cv-06010 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2023 4:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
Kinsey Marie Bryant
|
|
Plaintiff
Bose Akinseye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniela Akinseye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Davida Akinseye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Akinseye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcus Akinseye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miracle Ogunlade
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 04/18 1:00 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cause of Action of Negligence Per Se filed by Bose Akinseye, Daniela Akinseye, Davida Akinseye, Deborah Akinseye, Marcus Akinseye, Miracle Ogunlade.(Matthews, Stewart) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
4
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Wed 04/03 11:15 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cause of Action of Negligence Per Se by Kinsey Marie Bryant. (Cunningham, Joseph) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/03 11:14 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Cause of Action of Negligence Per Se by Kinsey Marie Bryant. (Cunningham, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Tue 04/02 4:06 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held on or before 4/30/2024. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 5/7/2024. Jury Trial set for 3/24/2025 in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics . Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 2, 2024. (rwg) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Mon 04/01 3:10 PM
ORDER denying as moot15 Motion to Extend. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 1, 2024. (jlm) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/13 6:56 PM
NOTICE by Bose Akinseye Notice of Vacation (Matthews, Stewart) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/12 2:42 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kinsey Marie Bryant.(Cunningham, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/21 4:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Kinsey Marie Bryant served on 2/21/2024, answer due 3/13/2024. (Matthews, Stewart) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/14 12:40 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Kinsey Marie Bryant and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Requested
Wed 02/14 11:48 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to akinseye for service of the following document: 15 MOTION to Extend Time to and Motion for Amended Summons . (Matthews, Stewart) |
|
Sunday, January 21, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extend
Sun 01/21 12:40 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to and Motion for Amended Summons by Bose Akinseye, Daniela Akinseye, Davida Akinseye, Deborah Akinseye, Marcus Akinseye, Miracle Ogunlade.(Matthews, Stewart) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Reissued
Tue 10/31 10:13 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Reissued as to Kinsey Marie Bryant and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Requested
Tue 10/31 7:36 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Kinsey Marie Bryant for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Matthews, Stewart) Modified on 10/31/2023 (hnc) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 10/16 12:57 PM
ORDER denying11 MOTION for Substitute Service. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 16, 2023. (jlm) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 07/25 2:12 PM
MOTION Substitute Service by Bose Akinseye, Daniela Akinseye, Davida Akinseye, Deborah Akinseye, Marcus Akinseye, Miracle Ogunlade.(Matthews, Stewart) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Aff non-service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Faculty Staff Search, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Proof of non-service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit BeenVerified, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit People Search, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Active Facebook Posting | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/22 8:04 PM
NOTICE by Bose Akinseye, Daniela Akinseye, Davida Akinseye, Deborah Akinseye, Marcus Akinseye, Miracle Ogunlade Notice of Vacation (Matthews, Stewart) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/15 2:28 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. AMENDED SUMMONS Issued as to Kinsey Marie Bryant and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 05/15 2:20 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Amend/Correct Summons. The Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to issue an amended summons. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 15, 2023. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(jlm) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 04/27 11:20 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Summons by Bose Akinseye, Daniela Akinseye, Davida Akinseye, Deborah Akinseye, Marcus Akinseye.(Matthews, Stewart) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of non-service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Faculty Search, | ||
Att: 3 proposed order | ||
Thursday, January 26, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/26 8:35 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Kinsey Marie Bryant and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Requested
Wed 01/25 3:24 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Kinsey Marie Bryant for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Matthews, Stewart) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Requested
Wed 01/25 2:19 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Kinsey Marie Bryant for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Matthews, Stewart) |
|
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Wed 01/25 2:34 PM
Complaint filing fee paid re2 Complaint : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2720164.. (Matthews, Stewart) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Mon 01/23 1:30 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/23 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kinsey Marie Bryant, filed by Marcus Akinseye, Deborah Akinseye, Bose Akinseye, Davida Akinseye, Daniela Akinseye, Miracle Ogunlade.(jlm) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 01/23 1:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bose Akinseye, Daniela Akinseye, Davida Akinseye, Deborah Akinseye, Marcus Akinseye, Miracle Ogunlade. (jlm) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Mon 01/23 1:32 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/25/2023 (jlm) |