Cline v. Munasib
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-01009 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Ashley County Circuit Court, 02CV-23-00001-3 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2023 5:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sharthak Munasib
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Elmo Cline
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Leave Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Mon 03/18 5:01 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Dismiss Case; this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Further, Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment10 and Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint13 are hereby DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 18, 2024. (tmc) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Pretrial Disclosure Sheet
Thu 02/22 2:27 PM
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Sharthak Munasib. (Knox, Kristopher) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 01/12 2:08 PM
MOTION of Jim Jackson to Withdraw as Attorney Letter from Carl Elmo Cline discharging Morris Bart & Jim Jackson as his attorneys dated 1/8/2024 by Carl Elmo Cline. (Jackson, Jim) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 01/10 12:29 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jim R. Jackson withdrawn and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 10, 2024.(mll) (Main Document 23 replaced on 1/10/2024) (mll) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 01/09 4:19 PM
MOTION of Jim Jackson to Withdraw as Attorney for the Plaintiff by Carl Elmo Cline. (Jackson, Jim) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 11/08 1:08 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sharthak Munasib. (Knox, Kristopher) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
4
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Tue 11/07 11:44 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of19 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant by Carl Elmo Cline. (Jackson, Jim) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 11/07 11:40 AM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carl Elmo Cline. (Jackson, Jim) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 11/07 8:29 AM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re16 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice filed by Sharthak Munasib. (Knox, Kristopher) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Mon 11/06 3:40 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of16 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Carl Elmo Cline. (Jackson, Jim) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 11/06 3:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Carl Elmo Cline. (Jackson, Jim) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 11/03 4:03 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re13 MOTION for Leave to of Court to File an Amended Complaint filed by Sharthak Munasib.(Knox, Kristopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 2 | ||
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Mon 10/30 3:30 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of13 MOTION for Leave to of Court to File an Amended Complaint by Carl Elmo Cline. (Jackson, Jim) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Leave
Mon 10/30 3:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to of Court to File an Amended Complaint by Carl Elmo Cline. (Jackson, Jim) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
6
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Tue 10/24 4:31 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sharthak Munasib.(Knox, Kristopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit N | ||
11 | 11
msupport
Statement of Facts
Tue 10/24 4:17 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sharthak Munasib. (Knox, Kristopher) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 10/24 4:15 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sharthak Munasib. (Knox, Kristopher) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Final Scheduling Order
Thu 04/20 1:35 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 4/29/2024 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 20, 2023. (rwg) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 04/04 1:54 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Sharthak Munasib. (Knox, Kristopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Tue 03/07 2:32 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted by 4/4/2023. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 4/11/2023. Jury Trial set for the week of 3/11/2024 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on 3/7/2023. (rwg) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/30 4:31 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sharthak Munasib.(Knox, Kristopher) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 01/30 2:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons & Complaint, filed by Carl Elmo Cline. Sharthak Munasib served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Jackson, Jim) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Mon 01/23 3:19 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll) |
|
3 | 3
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/23 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sharthak Munasib filed by Carl Elmo Cline. (Originally filed in state court.) (mll) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 01/23 3:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sharthak Munasib.(mll) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 01/23 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ashley County Circuit Court, case number 02CV-23-01-3 filed by Sharthak Munasib.(mll) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Mon 01/23 3:23 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/25/2023.(mll) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Mon 01/23 3:57 PM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2719067.. (Knox, Kristopher) |