Gover v. The White House Company, Inc. et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-05017 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2023 4:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mortiman Sons of Peridition Employees and Contractors
|
|
Defendant
The White House Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Benny M Gover
in all Combinations, Mutations, Permutations 14661 Cliffbriar
West Fork, AR 72774 |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 13, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Tue 02/13 8:12 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER noting that the Clerk's office is in receipt of documents mailed by Mr. Gover. The Court has reviewed these documents. It appears Mr. Gover received from the Clerk's office the documents he recently attempted to file--unsuccessfully--along with the text-only order of explanation, and he decided to mail all these documents right back to the Clerk's office, along with a few lines of handwritten commentary. These documents are to be RETURNED to Mr. Gover. Further, the Clerk is advised that if any such documents are received in the future, they need not be returned. The Court will only consider the following documents for filing: motions, complaints, appellate materials, and appropriate requests for Court relief. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 13, 2024. (ee) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 01/30 10:12 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER noting that Mr. Gover has attempted to make another filing in this case (see attached documents under seal). The filing is frivolous. Mr. Gover is a restricted filer. Accordingly, the Clerk is instructed not to file the document of record and instead return it to Mr. Gover with a copy of this text order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 30, 2024. (ee) (tg) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Thu 01/18 2:01 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER noting that Mr. Gover has attempted to make another filing in this case (see attached documents under seal). The filing is frivolous. Mr. Gover is a restricted filer. Accordingly, the Clerk is instructed not to file the document of record and instead return it to Mr. Gover with a copy of this text order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 18, 2024. (ee) (tg) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Mon 01/08 2:38 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER noting that Mr. Gover has attempted to make another filing in this case (see attached documents under seal). The filing is frivolous. Mr. Gover is a restricted filer. Accordingly, the Clerk is instructed not to file the document of record and instead return it to Mr. Gover with a copy of this text order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 8, 2024. (ee) (lgd) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Mon 03/06 3:17 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER noting that Mr. Gover has attempted to make another filing in this case (see attached document under seal). The filing is frivolous. Mr. Gover is a restricted filer. Accordingly, the Clerk is instructed not to file the document of record and instead return it to Mr. Gover with a copy of this text order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 6, 2023. (ee) (tg) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 03/01 1:36 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER noting that Mr. Gover has attempted to make another filing in this case (see attached document under seal). The filing is frivolous gobbledygook. Mr. Gover is a restricted filer. Accordingly, the Clerk is instructed not to file the document of record and instead return it to Mr. Gover with a copy of this text order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 1, 2023. (ee) (tg) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Wed 02/22 10:07 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER noting that Mr. Gover has attempted to make another filing in this case (see attached document under seal). The filing is frivolous. Mr. Gover is a restricted filer. Accordingly, the Clerk is instructed not to file the document of record and instead return it to Mr. Gover with a copy of this text order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 22, 2023. (ee) (src) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 01/23 3:18 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to close case (see Order for specifics). (Civil Case Terminated) Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 23, 2023. (tg) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 01/23 3:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Benny M Gover. (tg) |
|
2 | 2
11
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Mon 01/23 3:10 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of1 Complaint by Benny M Gover. (tg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/23 3:08 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mortiman Sons of Peridition Employees and Contractors, The White House Company, Inc. filed by Benny M Gover.(tg) |