Serta Simmons Bedding, LLC and World of Sleep Outlets, LLC
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:23-bk-90020 |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2023 |
Debtor
Serta Simmons Bedding, LLC
2451 Industry Ave
Doraville, GA 30360-3159 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
1. | Serta Simmons Bedding files Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection (furnituretoday.com) |
Submitted Wed 01/25/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago |
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
1295 | 1295
1
pgs
court
Record on Appeal Transmitted Under Rule 8010(b)
Fri 02/16 2:57 PM
Record Transmitted under Rule 8010(b). On 04/21/2023b and Amended on 06/22/2023, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned Judge Andrew S. Hanen, Civil Action 4:23-cv-01482.. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. (HortenciaLerma) |