Brian Rogers et al v. Home Depot et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-02069 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 13, 2015 11:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
US Home Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Remodelers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THD At-Home Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Casey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Rogers
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Home Depot
Terminated: 01/29/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
159 | 159
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/14 10:42 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case158 . (twdb) |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
158 | 158
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 01/10 5:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by PLAINTIFF Amy Casey.(Attorney Andrew H Haas added to party Amy Casey(pty:pla))(Haas, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |