Heck v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00351 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Eighth Judicial District Court, A-23-865795-C |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 2:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Heck
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Wed 02/07 1:03 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.. (Keating, John) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Mon 01/22 10:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/22/2024. On September 27, 2023, the Court STAYED this case pending arbitration. (Order, ECF No. 16 ). The Court ordered the parties to submit a Joint Status Report every 90 days addressing the status of the case and the progress of arbitration proceedings. ( Id. ). No Joint Status Report has been filed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by February 12, 2024. Failure to timely file a Joint Status Report may result in this case being closed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SKV) |
||
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Case Stayed
Thu 09/28 9:16 AM
ORDER Granting15 Stipulation for Binding Arbitration and Dismiss Bad Faith Claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a joint status report informing the Court of the progress of the arbitration proceedings every 90 days. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation
Wed 09/27 10:13 AM
STIPULATION for Binding Arbitration and Dismiss Bad Faith Claims by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Keating, John) (other) (presiding) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Tue 05/23 2:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/5/2023. Motions due by 10/5/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Tue 05/23 2:02 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Mon 05/22 1:55 PM
Amended Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re11 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Plaintiff Douglas Heck.. (Livingston, Zachary) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Mon 05/15 1:27 PM
ORDER Denying without prejudice10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Amended Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Fri 05/12 9:38 AM
Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Douglas Heck.. (Livingston, Zachary) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 05/12 9:37 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Douglas Heck. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Livingston, Zachary) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/28 1:18 PM
ORDER. The parties are Hereby Ordered to file, no later than May 12, 2023, a joint proposed discovery plan. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/06 4:13 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.. (Keating, John) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Thu 03/09 10:46 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.. (Keating, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Tue 03/07 3:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/7/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/22/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) | |
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 03/07 2:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insuranc Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Keating, John) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/07 2:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insuranc Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/17/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/21/2023.(Keating, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Demand for Jury Trial | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition Removal
Tue 03/07 9:29 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-865795-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7227343) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insuranc Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/17/2023. (Keating, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 03/07 3:39 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC) |
||
order
Standing Order
Tue 03/07 3:40 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |