Atanasoff v. Bradford et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Anne R Traum |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00358 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 3:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Roger P. Beynon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Zackary K. Bradford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Larry McNeill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew S. Schultz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas L. Wood
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Andrea Ciceri
|
Represented By
|
Nominal Defendant
Cleanspark, Inc,
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Atanasoff
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago |
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 10/05 2:24 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re33 Order on Stipulation addressed to James M. Ficaro. RTS, unable to forward. (AMMi) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 06/30 10:00 AM
ORDER Remanding case to state court. Accordingly, it is further ordered that the following outstanding motions are moot: Motion to Consolidate (ECF No.10 ); Motion to Remand (ECF No.11 ); Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.26 ); Motion to Stay (ECF No.27 ); Motion for Leave to File Document (ECF No.31 ); Second Motion for Leave to File Document (ECF No.35 ). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 6/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: certified copy of order and docket sheet mailed to state court - RGDG) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice Other
Wed 06/28 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Petition for Removal of Civil Action by Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Cleanspark, Inc,, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood re1 Petition for Removal,.. (Connot, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Motion Leave to File Document/Excess Pages
Tue 06/13 9:16 AM
Second MOTION for Leave to File Document re11 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Eric Atanasoff. Responses due by 6/27/2023.(Aldrich, John) (dispositive) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response
Mon 06/12 4:01 PM
RESPONSE to27 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery,26 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Eric Atanasoff. Replies due by 6/19/2023.(Aldrich, John) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 06/06 10:27 AM
ORDER APPROVING ECF No.32 Stipulation to Reset Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response due by 6/12/2023 . Defendants' Reply due by 7/7/2023 as to ECF No.26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 6/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Stipulation
Thu 06/01 2:50 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re26 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Eric Atanasoff. (Aldrich, John) (extend) (dispositive) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Motion Leave to File Document/Excess Pages
Wed 05/17 2:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document re11 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Eric Atanasoff. Responses due by 5/31/2023.(Aldrich, John) (dispositive) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Appendix
Fri 05/05 2:55 PM
APPENDIX of Exhibits to Declaration of Colleen E. McCarty in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Action (Vol. 2) to28 Declaration,27 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery,26 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,..(McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit G | ||
29 | 29
misc
Appendix
Fri 05/05 2:51 PM
APPENDIX of Exhibits to Declaration of Colleen E. McCarty in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Action (Vol. 1) to28 Declaration,27 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery,26 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,..(McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
28 | 28
misc
Declaration
Fri 05/05 2:46 PM
DECLARATION of Colleen E. McCarty in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Action re27 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery,26 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,.. (McCarty, Colleen) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Motion Stay Case or Discovery
Fri 05/05 2:42 PM
MOTION to Stay Case re26 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,. Responses due by 5/19/2023.(McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Defendant Roger P. Beynon, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Defendant Larry McNeill, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Defendant Thomas L. Wood | ||
26 | 26
motion
Motion Dismiss
Fri 05/05 2:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,. Responses due by 5/19/2023.(McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Defendant Roger P. Beynon, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Larry McNeill, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Thomas L. Wood | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply
Tue 04/25 10:36 AM
REPLY to Response to11 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Eric Atanasoff. (Aldrich, John) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply
Mon 04/24 2:30 PM
REPLY to Response to10 Motion to Consolidate Cases, by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,. (McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
6
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 04/21 11:22 AM
ORDER APPROVING ECF No.21 Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss - NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the Parties hereto, through their undersigned counsel, subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: 1. Plaintiff's deadline to oppose any motion to dismiss the Complaint that Defendants file is extended until on or before June 5, 2023 (6/5/2023). 2. Defendants' deadline to reply in support of any motion to dismiss the Complaint that Defendants file is extended until on or before June 26, 2023 (6/26/2023). Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 4/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response
Tue 04/18 11:28 AM
RESPONSE to11 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,. Replies due by 4/25/2023. (McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation
Mon 04/17 3:08 PM
STIPULATION and [proposed order] to Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss re13 Order on Stipulation,,, by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,. (McCarty, Colleen) (other) (dispositive) |
|
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 04/17 1:19 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.18 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No.15 Response re ECF No.10 Motion to Consolidate due by 4/24/2023 . Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 4/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 04/13 2:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Cleanspark, Inc,, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (McCarty, Colleen) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation
Thu 04/13 1:19 PM
Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Consolidate re15 Response by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,. (McCarty, Colleen) (extend) (nondispositive) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response
Mon 04/10 1:43 PM
RESPONSE to16 Notice (Other), by Plaintiff Eric Atanasoff. (Aldrich, John) |
|
Saturday, April 08, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice Other
Sat 04/08 9:43 AM
NOTICE OF FOUR NEW SUBSTANTIALLY SIMILAR DERIVATIVE ACTIONS THAT SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED WITH THIS CONSOLIDATED DERIVATIVE ACTION PURSUANT TO THE COURTS ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES DATED JUNE 29, 2021 AND WITHOUT FURTHER MOTION PRACTICE by Andrea Ciceri.. (Leverty, Patrick) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response
Fri 04/07 1:51 PM
RESPONSE to10 Motion to Consolidate Cases, by Plaintiff Eric Atanasoff. Replies due by 4/14/2023. (Aldrich, John) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/07 11:09 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,.. (McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 04/07 10:06 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that ECF No.12 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. It is granted to the extent that Defendants deadline to respond to the complaint shall be May 5, 2023 (5/5/2023). To the extent the parties stipulate to an extended motion to dismiss briefingschedule, they must file a separate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation
Wed 04/05 1:57 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,. (McCarty, Colleen) (extend) (answer) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion Remand to State Court
Tue 04/04 1:21 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Eric Atanasoff. Responses due by 4/18/2023.(Aldrich, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Motion Consolidate Cases
Fri 03/24 6:02 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,. Responses due by 4/7/2023.(McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D | ||
misc
QC Notice
Fri 03/24 7:50 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney James M. Ficaro is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to complete the registration. (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Thu 03/23 9:06 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,.. (McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/23 11:29 AM
ORDER APPROVING ECF No.6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James M. Ficaro for Eric Atanasoff and approving Designation of Local Counsel John P. Alddrich. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/22/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition
Wed 03/22 11:19 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James M. Ficaro and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John P. Aldrich (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7243422) by Plaintiff Eric Atanasoff. (Aldrich, John) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 12:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Cleanspark, Inc,, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice Related Cases
Thu 03/09 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 21-1004 by Defendants Roger P. Beynon, Zackary K. Bradford, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Thomas L. Wood, Nominal Defendant Cleanspark, Inc,. .(McCarty, Colleen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E | ||
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Wed 03/08 8:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/8/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/23/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 03/08 8:48 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM) |
||
notice
Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP
Wed 03/08 10:35 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel James M. Ficaro to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Petition Removal
Wed 03/08 8:45 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-23-866492-C, by Roger P. Beynon, Larry McNeill, Matthew S. Schultz, Cleanspark, Inc, Zackary K. Bradford, Thomas L. Wood. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/17/2023. (HAM) |
|
Att: 1 23 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |