Scott v. Kijakazi
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00365 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment
Wed 02/28 12:09 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Kilolo Kijakazi against Jack C.S. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/28/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to Agency Order on Countermotion to Affirm the Agency Decision
Wed 02/28 12:01 PM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for remand12 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Commissioners cross motion to affirm16 is granted. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/27/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply Brief (for social security cases only)
Thu 08/17 1:49 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Commissioner Brief by Plaintiff Jack Christopher Scott, II re16 Plaintiff Brief. (Kalagian, Marc) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response
Thu 08/03 3:58 PM
RESPONSE to12 Motion to Remand to Agency by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Replies due by 8/10/2023. (Priddy, David) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Countermotion Affirm the Agency Decision
Thu 08/03 3:56 PM
COUNTERMOTION to Affirm the Agency Decision by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Responses due by 8/17/2023. (Priddy, David) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Fri 07/07 1:49 PM
ORDER Granting14 Motion to Extend Time re12 Motion to Remand to Agency. Responses due by 8/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Motion Extend/Shorten Time
Wed 07/05 3:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to respond re12 Motion to Remand to Agency by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Responses due by 7/19/2023. (Priddy, David) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Fri 06/23 8:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Priddy on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Priddy, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Brief
Wed 06/07 4:32 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Jack Christopher Scott, II. . (Kalagian, Marc) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certified Administrative Record
Mon 05/08 9:08 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (CAR) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Electronic access to the CAR is restricted to case participants only.) (Welsh, Blaine) |
|
Att: 1 Vol. 1 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice Manual Filing in SS Appeal Case
Mon 05/08 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Manual Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.,, Description: Social Security Administrative Record, manually filed with the Magistrate Judge's chambers. (Welsh, Blaine) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Mon 05/08 8:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Blaine T Welsh on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Welsh, Blaine) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 9:27 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jack Christopher Scott, II. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc) |
|
misc
QC Notice
Fri 03/24 8:59 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Jack Christopher Scott, II. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/31/2023. (no image attached) (EDS) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Tue 03/21 7:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Franco Becia on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Becia, Franco) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 1:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi by Jack Christopher Scott, II. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/24/2023. Proof of service due by 6/12/2023. (Filed per4 Order - KF) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 1:29 PM
ORDER Granting1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to file the complaint (ECF No. 1-1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to provide notice of this action to the Commissioner pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in SS Case
Mon 03/13 4:17 PM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (Kalagian, Marc) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice Assignment of Case to MJ & Consent Form in SS Case
Thu 03/09 7:41 AM
NOTICE pursuant to General Order 2019-08: This case has been randomly assigned to a Magistrate Judge pending the parties' consent or declination. Pursuant to 28 USC § 636(c), with written consent of all parties, a Magistrate Judge may conduct all proceedings in a case, including all pretrial and trial proceedings, entry of judgment, and post-trial motions. Any appeals will be made directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. A link is being provided to the form on the court's website to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (A copy of the notice and consent form have been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) Consent or declination due by 3/19/2023. (KF) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/08 10:18 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Jack Christopher Scott, II.(Kalagian, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 03/09 7:40 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF) |