Nguyen v. Crystal Bay Casino, LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00092 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 04, 2023 1:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Crystal Bay Casino, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Huey Nguyen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fernando Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sophia Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Wed 04/10 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katrina Weil on behalf of Defendant Crystal Bay Casino, LLC. (Weil, Katrina) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
9
pgs
order
Order on Unopposed Motion
Mon 02/05 2:13 PM
PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER GRANTING ECF No.34 Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement : Class Certification for Settlement Purposes Only. Final Approval Hearing shall be held on August 5, 2024 in Reno courtroom 5. (See pdf order for additional specifics and Settlement Timeline.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/5/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
minord
Minute Order
Mon 02/05 4:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/5/2024. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Fairness hearing set by ECF No.35 will be heard at 1:30 PM on 8/5/2024 in Reno Courtroom 5 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
||
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Unopposed Motion
Thu 02/01 11:15 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 33 Minute Order, by Plaintiffs Fernando Mendoza, Sophia Mendoza, Huey Nguyen. Responses due by 2/15/2024.(Coelho, Thiago) (settlement) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Thiago M. Coelho in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Thiago M. Coelho (Settlement Agreement), | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of David K. Lietz in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of David K. Lietz (Firm Resume), | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order re Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement | ||
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice Other
Mon 12/18 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Fernando Mendoza, Sophia Mendoza, Huey Nguyen..(Wise, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
minord
Minute Order
Mon 12/18 2:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/18/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Court has reviewed the notice of settlement (ECF No.32 ). All deadlines are suspended. The parties are directed to file settlement documents or a joint status report within 45 days. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
||
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Mon 12/04 12:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/4/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The parties filed a status report (ECF No.30 ) that indicated that a private mediation had been scheduled for 10/30/2023. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 12/18/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
||
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Tue 09/05 11:27 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Fernando Mendoza, Sophia Mendoza, Huey Nguyen.. (Lietz, David) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 07/06 1:53 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.28 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that litigation is stayed during the pendency of mediation. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report informing the Court as to the date on which the parties intend to mediate and their choice of mediator within 60 days of this Order (9/4/2023) . Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Stipulation
Thu 07/06 9:43 AM
Joint STIPULATION TO STAY CASE Pending Mediation by Plaintiffs Fernando Mendoza, Sophia Mendoza, Huey Nguyen. (Lietz, David) (stay) (dispositive) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
cmp
Complaint Amended
Thu 06/29 5:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Crystal Bay Casino, LLC by Huey Nguyen. No changes to parties. (Lietz, David) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
5
pgs
order
Order
Thu 06/08 2:14 PM
|
|
25 | 25
order
Standing Order
Thu 06/08 1:49 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER - MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA BALDWIN (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CLB) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion to Dismiss Order Consolidate Cases
Tue 05/30 3:16 PM
REASSIGNMENT AND CONSOLIDATION ORDER - Case No. 3:23-cv-00099-ART-CSD is reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda Du. The Clerk of Court is directed to update Case No. 3:23-cv-00099- ART-CSD to appear as Case No. 3:23-cv-00099-MMD-CSD. It is further ordered that Case No. 3:23-cv-00099-MMD-CSD is consolidated into Case No. 3:23-cv-00092-MMD-CLB. The Clerk of Court is directed to update the docket accordingly. The Clerk of Court is further directed to administratively close Case No. 3:23-cv00099-MMD-CSD. It is further ordered that all future pleadings must bear Case No. 3:23-cv-00092- MMD-CLB. It is further ordered that Plaintiffs must file a consolidated complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. It is further ordered that Defendant's pending motions to dismiss filed before consolidation (ECF No. 23 in Case No. 3:23-cv-00092-MMD-CLB and ECF No. 29 in Case No. 3:23-cv-00099-ART-CSD) are denied without prejudice to re-filing in Case No. 3:23-cv-00092-MMD-CLB, appropriately updated in response to the forthcoming consolidated complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du, and District Judge Anne R. Traum on 5/30/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Motion Dismiss
Mon 05/22 4:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Crystal Bay Casino, LLC. Responses due by 6/5/2023.(Harrison, Kiley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Sample Notification Letter from State of Maine Government Website | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice Related Cases
Thu 05/11 2:47 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:23-cv-00099-ART-CSD by Defendant Crystal Bay Casino, LLC. .(Harrison, Kiley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Stipulation and Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint | ||
21 | 21
motion
Motion Consolidate Cases
Thu 05/11 2:21 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Crystal Bay Casino, LLC. Responses due by 5/25/2023.(Harrison, Kiley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Stipulation and Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
7
pgs
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/27 11:11 AM
ORDER APPROVING ECF No.19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy M. Hayes for Crystal Bay Casino, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kiley Harrison. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/26/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition
Wed 04/26 12:28 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Timothy M. Hayes and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kiley A. Harrison (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7279558) by Defendant Crystal Bay Casino, LLC. (Harrison, Kiley) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
6
pgs
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/20 3:47 PM
ORDER APPROVING ECF No.17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James W. Davidson for Crystal Bay Casino, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kiley A. Harrison. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/20/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition
Wed 04/19 7:37 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James W. Davidson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kiley A. Harrison (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7273029) by Defendant Crystal Bay Casino, LLC. (Harrison, Kiley) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Wed 04/19 7:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Crystal Bay Casino, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Harrison, Kiley) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Wed 04/12 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kiley Harrison on behalf of Defendant Crystal Bay Casino, LLC. (Harrison, Kiley) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
8
pgs
order
Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/30 2:20 PM
ORDER APPROVING ECF No.10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David K. Lietz for Huey Nguyen and approving Designation of Local Counsel David Hilton Wise. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/30/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response
Wed 03/29 10:41 AM
RESPONSE to 9 Minute Order,,,, by Plaintiff Huey Nguyen. (Wise, David) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice Other
Wed 03/29 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Petition by Huey Nguyen re8 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition.. (Wise, David) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 03/29 9:33 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huey Nguyen. Crystal Bay Casino, LLC waiver sent on 3/23/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Wise, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition
Tue 03/28 5:16 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David K. Lietz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David Hilton Wise (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7250377) by Plaintiff Huey Nguyen.(Wise, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Additional Court Admissions, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Wed 03/22 7:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/22/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. On March 20, 2023, Gary M. Klinger submitted a petition for permission to practice (ECF No. 8 ("PHV")). In the PHV, Klinger identified cases during the last three years where he has appeared as counsel under Local Rule IA 11-2 as consisting of four cases, and a fifth case (Case No. 2:23-cv-304 ("Pending PHV") where his PHV is pending. (Id. at 3.) However, Judge Boulware approved the Pending PHV on March 16, 2023 (see ECF No. 18 in Case No. 2:23-cv-304-RFB-BNW). This means Klinger has appeared as local counsel under LR IA 11-2 in five cases. LR IA 11-2(f)(1) provides, in pertinent part, that "more than five appearances... in a three-year period is excessive use of this rule." Klinger is ordered to show cause as to why the Court should not deny his request under LR IA 11-2(f). Klinger's response to this order must be filed within seven days. Failure to comply will result in denial of Klinger's PHV. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition
Mon 03/20 12:59 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Klinger and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David Hilton Wise (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7240726) by Plaintiff Huey Nguyen. (Wise, David) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Huey Nguyen. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wise, David) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
notice
Clerks Notice Reassign Judge
Fri 03/10 7:44 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:23-cv-00092-MMD-CLB . (no image attached) (DRS) |
||
order
Standing Order
Fri 03/10 9:11 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/09 8:06 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crystal Bay Casino, LLC. (DRM) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 03/09 8:04 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DRM) |
||
notice
Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP
Thu 03/09 11:22 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gary Klinger to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/23/2023. (no image attached) (DRS) |
||
minord
Minute Order Recusal
Thu 03/09 11:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/9/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KJM) |
||
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/08 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Crystal Bay Casino, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7229748) by Huey Nguyen. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/18/2023. Proof of service due by 6/6/2023. (Wise, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |