Sayegh v. Clark County School District
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Anne R Traum |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00369 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 04, 2023 3:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Clark County School District
Clark County School District 5100 W. Sahara Ave
Las Vegas, NV 89146 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suhair Sayegh
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Fri 10/06 1:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/6/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Sutherland. The Court will hear oral argument on the 7 Motion to Remand Case to the Eighth Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada on Friday, October 13, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas Courtroom 6C before U.S. District Court Judge Anne R. Traum. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KLS) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
5
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order
Tue 07/11 12:34 PM
ORDER Granting17 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 12/26/2023. Motions due by 1/23/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation
Mon 07/10 2:43 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Clark County School District. (Dillard, Thomas) (extend) (discovery) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Wed 04/19 8:38 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Tue 04/18 12:59 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING ECF No.14 Stipulation: Discovery due by 9/25/2023 . Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2023 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/24/2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Mon 04/17 10:40 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Suhair Sayegh.. (Spretnak, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply
Mon 04/10 6:14 PM
REPLY to Response to7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Suhair Sayegh. (Spretnak, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/07 10:18 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Clark County School District.. (Dillard, Thomas) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response
Mon 04/03 3:58 PM
RESPONSE to7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Clark County School District. Replies due by 4/10/2023. (Dillard, Thomas) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Petition for Removal
Mon 03/27 10:40 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand re4 Petition for Removal,, filed by Clark County School District. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/6/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/11/2023.(Dillard, Thomas) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Fri 03/24 4:35 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Clark County School District.. (Dillard, Thomas) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 11:09 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Suhair Sayegh. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Spretnak, Robert) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Motion Remand to State Court
Mon 03/20 11:07 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court re4 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Suhair Sayegh. Responses due by 4/3/2023.(Spretnak, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Complaint (Jury Demanded)) | ||
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Thu 03/09 1:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/9/2023. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ortiz. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/24/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 1:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dillard, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Petition Removal
Thu 03/09 1:20 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-23-865192-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7231049) by Clark County School District. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/19/2023. (Dillard, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint District Court, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - AOS District Court | ||
notice
Notice Attorney Action Required
Thu 03/09 9:38 AM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to1 Notice (Other). Attorney Thomas Dillard advised to properly refile your opening documents and use the event petition removal which can be found under commencement of an action. (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 03/09 1:35 PM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (LOE) |
||
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Wed 03/08 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dillard, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice Other
Wed 03/08 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Removal of Civil Action by Clark County School District..(Dillard, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service |