Contreras, v. Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00406 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 29, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Thu 04/11 11:08 AM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees23 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
23 | 23
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Wed 04/10 2:29 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $5700. filed by Plaintiff Guadalupe Jose Contreras.(Krank, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 03/01 2:42 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, Related to: Memorandum Opinion and Order of Remand21 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is reversed and the matter is remanded for further administrative action consistent with the Memorandum Opinion and Order of Remand filed concurrently herewith. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr) |
|
21 | 21
21
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion on Social Security Cases
Fri 03/01 2:37 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF REMAND by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is REVERSED, and this matter is REMANDED for further administrative action consistent with this Opinion. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 12/21 4:00 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SUBSTITUTING CURRENT COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION AS DEFENDANT by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: Pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Commissioner Martin O'Malley is hereby substituted as the Defendant in this action. (et) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Fri 09/15 10:08 PM
BRIEF filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Commissioner's Brief and Opposition to Plaintiff's Brief (Naicker, Tina) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/16 9:04 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File17 . The scheduling order shall be modified as follows: Defendant's Cross-Motion and Opposition Due: September 15, 2023; Plaintiff's Optional Reply Due: September 29, 2023. (hr) |
|
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 08/15 3:21 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Commissioner's Memorandum and Opposition to Plaintiff's Memorandum filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Naicker, Tina) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/11 12:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File15 . The scheduling order shall be modified as follows: Defendant's Cross-Motion and Opposition Due: August 15, 2023; Plaintiff's Optional Reply Due: August 29, 2023. (hr) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 07/10 8:38 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion and Oppositon to Plaintiff's Brief filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Naicker, Tina) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 07/06 1:57 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael K Marriott counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Michael Marriott is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Marriott, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 07/06 1:40 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tina Naicker counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Tina L Naicker as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Thu 06/08 5:06 PM
BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Guadalupe Jose Contreras. (Krank, Laura) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 05/09 8:38 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) (cu) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript Oral Hearing, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4 | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/22 9:06 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV23-406 JC on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Tue 03/21 11:51 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Wed 03/15 11:37 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Guadalupe Jose Contreras. (Krank, Laura) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/14 4:42 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (see document for details) (hr) |
|
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 03/14 3:21 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Granting2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED. (es) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Guadalupe Jose Contreras,, (Krank, Laura) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/09 9:27 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Guadalupe Jose Contreras,. (Krank, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/09 9:26 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Guadalupe Jose Contreras,. (Krank, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 9:25 AM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Guadalupe Jose Contreras,. (Attorney Laura E. Krank added to party Guadalupe Jose Contreras,(pty:pla))(Krank, Laura) |