Fagan v. First American Title Insurance Company
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00371 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
First American Title Insurance Company
McDonald Carano LLP 2300 West Sahara Avenue, Suite 1200
Las Vegas, NV 89102 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip J Fagan, Jr
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
AAL-JAY Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Christiano DeCarlo
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Lail Leonard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
63 | 63
misc
Supplement
Fri 02/16 2:49 PM
SUPPLEMENT to 62 Motion Hearing,, by Plaintiffs Philip J Fagan, Jr, Philip J Fagan, Jr.(Schmidt, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 02/15 11:58 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2024 before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: D Smith ; Pla Counsel: Allison Schmidt ; Def Counsel: Aaron Maurice ; Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci ; Time of Hearing: 11:08 a.m. 11:17 a.m ; Courtroom: 7C The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations and argument of counsel as to 9 , 25 and 27 Motions to Dismiss. Parties have until Tuesday, February 20, 2024 to file a Supplement as instructed. Motion Hearing shall continue on 2/29/2024 at 10:45 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) |