Jan Doe v. USCIS et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00420 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:12 AM PDT |
Defendant
Los Angeles Asylum Office
PO BOX 65015
Anaheim, CA 92815 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
USCIS
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services C/O Office of the Chief Counsel 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
David M. Radel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jan Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 02/21 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jan Doe. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Sari, Yakup) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 05/08 12:17 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application10 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until March 30, 2024. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) |
|
10 | 10
stip
Stay Case
Mon 05/08 10:26 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Los Angeles Asylum Office, David M. Radel, USCIS.(Attorney Gwen M Gamble added to party Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Gwen M Gamble added to party David M. Radel(pty:dft), Attorney Gwen M Gamble added to party USCIS(pty:dft))(Gamble, Gwen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 10:53 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 3:06 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office. (rolm) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/10 3:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff`s Attorney Jan Doe. (Sari, Yakup) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 3:18 PM
Plaintiff`s NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff`s Attorney Jan Doe, (Sari, Yakup) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 03/10 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 03/10 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/10 11:36 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34924836 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff`s Attorney Jan Doe (1). (Attorney Yakup Sari added to party Jan Doe (1)(pty:pla))(Sari, Yakup) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |