Omeed Shaaf et al v. Tesla, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00407 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
Tesla, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Fatemeh Hadjian
an individual 73159 Ajo Lane
Palm Desert, CA 92260 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omeed Shaaf
an individual 73159 Ajo Lane
Palm Desert, CA 92260 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
58 | 58
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 03/21 4:19 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court is in receipt of the Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Omeed Shaaf. Dkt.56 . In light of Defendant Tesla, Inc. having appeared in this matter, see dkt. 17, the case will be dismissed and the matter will be closed if no objection is received within ten (10) days of this Order. Alternatively, the parties may file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) |
|
57 | 57
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
Thu 03/21 2:38 PM
ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT (S) by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The Court hereby ORDERS the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: INITIAL DISCLOSURE55 , for the following reasons: Discovery need not be filed with the Court. (aco) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1))
Thu 03/21 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c) filed by plaintiff Omeed Shaaf. (aco) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
misc
Disclosure
Mon 03/18 3:50 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Tesla Initial Designation of Expert Witnesses filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc. (Bruce, Robert) |