Amber Boykins Harper v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sunshine Suzanne Sykes |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00408 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:12 AM PDT |
Plaintiff
Amber Boykins Harper
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 08/04/2023
|
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Terminated: 05/19/2023
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Transunion, LLC
Terminated: 06/26/2023
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Fri 08/04 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Amber Boykins Harper pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Mon 06/26 9:32 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Amber Boykins Harper pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Transunion, LLC. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 05/26 10:37 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In light of the Notice of Settlement [Dkt.16 ] as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and the Notice of Settlement [Dkt.17 ] as to Defendant Transunion, LLC filed May 23, 2023, indicating that the case has settled, this action is placed in inactive status. By July 10, 2023, the parties shall file either (1) a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to comply with this Order in a timely manner, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of July 11, 2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. The Court further DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause issued on May 22, 2023 [Dkt. 15]. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Response
Tue 05/23 1:00 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Amber Boykins Harperto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,,15 (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Settlement
Tue 05/23 12:59 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (with Defendant TransUnion, LLC) filed by Plaintiff Amber Boykins Harper. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Settlement
Tue 05/23 12:58 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (with Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) filed by Plaintiff Amber Boykins Harper. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause
Mon 05/22 10:27 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before June 5, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not filed an answer or otherwise responded to the complaint. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged if Plaintiff files, before the deadline set forth above, a request for the entry of default with respect to the applicable Defendant(s). Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 55(a). IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Dismiss Party
Fri 05/19 10:08 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Delgadillo, Bryant) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 05/03 12:27 PM
ORDER ON SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT12 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The deadline for Chase to respond to the complaint is extended from May 3, 2023 to June 2, 2023. (lom) |
|
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 05/03 10:28 AM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer now due 6/2/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Delgadillo, Bryant) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 03/30 2:26 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer now due 5/3/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Attorney Bryant S Delgadillo added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Delgadillo, Bryant) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/20 4:11 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/13 9:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Amber Boykins Harper. upon Transunion, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/10/2023, answer due 5/9/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Colin Poling. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 5:36 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Transunion, LLC. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/09 5:33 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/09 5:33 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/09 5:32 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (sh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 10:12 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Amber Boykins-Harper. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amber Boykins-Harper, (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/09 10:11 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amber Boykins-Harper. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 10:10 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34924159 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Amber Boykins-Harper. (Attorney Joseph Brian Angelo added to party Amber Boykins-Harper(pty:pla))(Angelo, Joseph) |