Burgess v. Geico Indemnity Company
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00372 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Eighth Judicial District Court, A-23-866355-C |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 1:54 AM PDT |
Defendant
Geico Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yesiney Burgess
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case
Wed 10/25 1:18 PM
ORDER denying as moot13 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting18 Stipulation. Action dismissed each side to bear fees and costs. Clerk to close case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/24/2023. Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation
Tue 10/24 3:56 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL re1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company. (Miller, Lara) (dismissal) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 09/22 2:50 PM
ORDER Granting16 Stipulation to conduct certain depositions outside of discovery (first request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stipulation
Wed 09/20 4:03 PM
First STIPULATION and Order to Conduct Certain Depositions Outside of Discovery by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company. (Miller, Lara) (other) (discovery) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response
Wed 06/28 11:42 AM
REPLY to14 Response to [13} Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company. (Miller, Lara) Modified on 6/28/2023 (HAM) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response
Wed 06/14 9:59 PM
RESPONSE to13 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Plaintiff Yesiney Burgess. Replies due by 6/28/2023. (Lee, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Motion Summary Judgment
Wed 05/24 4:07 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company. Responses due by 6/14/2023.(Miller, Lara) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Demand Letter to GEICO, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Letter from GEICO with initial offer, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Letter from Plaintiff with offer of mediation, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Letter from GEICO accepting mediation, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit GEICO Policy, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Excerpts of Plaintiff's records from Advanced Occupational Health, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Excerpts of Plaintiff's records from Dr. William Muir, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit GEICO's letter to plaintiff dated 8/22/2022, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit GEICO's letter to plaintiff dated 9/20/2022, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Medical Exam and Records Review by Dr. Brandon Snead, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Traffic Accident Report, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Photo of Vehicle Damage | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
6
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Thu 04/27 11:53 AM
ORDER Granting10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/20/2023. Motions due by 10/20/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/27/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Thu 04/27 11:53 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (LOE) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Wed 04/26 10:25 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company.. (Miller, Lara) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 04/17 10:07 AM
ERROR: Interested Parties not added by attorney when filed. Notice entered to refile. CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Geico Indemnity Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Miller, Lara) Modified on 4/17/2023 (HAM) |
|
notice
Notice Attorney Action Required
Mon 04/17 11:03 AM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to8 Certificate of Interested Parties. ERROR: Interested Parties not added by attorney when filed. Notice entered to refile. (no image attached) (HAM) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Tue 04/11 10:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/11/2023. ORDER STRIKING GEICO'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES. The certificate of interested parties 2 filed by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company violates newly amended FRCP 7.1, which now requires that all parties in a diversity-jurisdiction case like this one identify the citizenship of "every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party." IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the certificate of interested parties 2 is STRUCK, and Geico has five days to file a new certificate that complies with FRCP 7.1. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD) |
||
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/29 3:55 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company.. (Miller, Lara) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Petition for Removal
Fri 03/24 10:56 AM
Defendant's ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Geico Indemnity Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/3/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/8/2023.(Miller, Lara) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Fri 03/24 10:47 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Geico Indemnity Company.. (Miller, Lara) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Thu 03/09 12:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/9/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/24/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 10:46 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Geico Indemnity Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Miller, Lara) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Petition Removal
Thu 03/09 10:39 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-866355-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7230653) by Geico Indemnity Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/19/2023. (Miller, Lara) |
|
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 03/09 12:12 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (TRW) |