Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc. et al v. State of California et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01779 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:12 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kevin Coomer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Langley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ty Murray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin Pearce
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Randolph Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
California Department of Parks and Recreations
Terminated: 07/14/2023
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
California Highway Patrol
Terminated: 07/14/2023
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State of California
Terminated: 07/14/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 01/18 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc.. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
minutes
Discovery Hearing
Wed 01/17 8:26 AM
MINUTES OF Informal Discovery Conference (via Zoom) Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: As stated above, Plaintiffs are ordered to provide responses no later than January 18, 2024. Plaintiffs are to specify the RFAs as to which their response is a denial. Upon receipt of Plaintiffs' responses to the RFAs, Defendants shall advise Plaintiffs whether Defendants stipulate, as permitted by Rule 36(a)(3), to January 18, 2024, for the responses. If Defendants do not so stipulate, then Plaintiffs may file a motion by January 19, 2024, specifying the RFAs as to which Plaintiffs seek relief from Rule 36(a)(3) and the basis for seeking that relief. Defendants' response to that motion shall be filed by January 23, 2024. The matter will be under submission as of that date. [See document for further information.] Court Reporter: Court Smart 1/16/24. (es) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/16 9:56 AM
DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Joint Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order and Continue Trial32 . No good cause shown. (jp) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
stip
Continue
Thu 01/11 11:17 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Order and Trial from April 30, 2024 to August 26, 2024 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only30 filed by Plaintiff Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc..(Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Mon 08/14 1:44 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than March 1, 2024. (jre) |
|
30 | 30
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Mon 08/14 1:42 PM
ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 4/30/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
29 | 29
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form
Mon 08/14 1:40 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2023. Discovery cut-off 2/1/2024. Motions due by 2/15/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 4/30/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (jre) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 08/07 7:59 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan JOINT RULE 26(F) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT ; estimated length of trial 21 days, filed by Defendants Kevin Coomer, Robert Cooper, Jeffrey Langley, Ty Murray, Kevin Pearce.. (Morrison, Norman) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 07/28 2:26 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,25 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants California Department of Parks and Recreations, California Highway Patrol, Kevin Coomer, Robert Cooper, Jeffrey Langley, Ty Murray, Kevin Pearce, State of California.(Attorney Norman Donald Morrison, IV added to party State of California(pty:dft))(Morrison, Norman) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 07/18 3:28 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff having filed a First Amended Complaint25 , The Motion to Dismiss23 is hereby denied as moot and taken off calendar. SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 07/14 4:43 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Kevin Coomer, Robert Cooper, Jeffrey Langley, Ty Murray, Kevin Pearce amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiff Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc.(Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 06/29 8:37 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/7/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 06/28 5:14 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants California Department of Parks and Recreations, California Highway Patrol, Kevin Coomer, Robert Cooper, Jeffrey Langley, Ty Murray, Kevin Pearce. Motion set for hearing on 8/7/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Morrison, Norman) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Norman D. Morrison, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 06/23 12:09 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)14 . The following error(s) was/were found: See [Prop] Order signature line - The name of the Judge is incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 06/22 5:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Randolph Jordan, Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc., upon Defendant California Department of Parks and Recreations served on 5/4/2023, answer due 5/25/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Johnson, authorized agaent for Department of Parks and Recreations in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
20 | 20
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 06/22 4:46 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Randolph Jordan, Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc., upon Defendant California Highway Patrol served on 5/4/2023, answer due 5/25/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sgt. Richwine, authorized agent for California Highway Patrol in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
19 | 19
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 06/22 4:44 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Randolph Jordan, Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc., upon Defendant Ty Murray served on 5/4/2023, answer due 5/25/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sgt. Richwine, authorized agent for Ty Murray in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
18 | 18
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 06/22 4:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Randolph Jordan, Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc., upon Defendant Kevin Coomer served on 5/4/2023, answer due 5/25/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sgt. Richwine, authorized agent for Kevin Coomer in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
17 | 17
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 06/22 4:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Randolph Jordan, Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc., upon Defendant Jeffrey Langley served on 5/3/2023, answer due 5/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kevin Pearce, authorized to accept for Jeffrey Langley in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
16 | 16
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 06/22 4:37 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Randolph Jordan, Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc., upon Defendant Robert Cooper served on 5/3/2023, answer due 5/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kevin Pearce, authorized to accept for Robert Cooper in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
15 | 15
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 06/22 4:34 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Randolph Jordan, Jordan and Associates Investments, Inc., upon Defendant Kevin Pearce served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kevin Pearce in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 06/22 3:48 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 28, 2023 filed by Defendants California Department of Parks and Recreations, California Highway Patrol, Kevin Coomer, Robert Cooper, Jeffrey Langley, Ty Murray, Kevin Pearce.(Attorney Norman Donald Morrison, IV added to party California Department of Parks and Recreations(pty:dft), Attorney Norman Donald Morrison, IV added to party California Highway Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney Norman Donald Morrison, IV added to party Kevin Coomer(pty:dft), Attorney Norman Donald Morrison, IV added to party Robert Cooper(pty:dft), Attorney Norman Donald Morrison, IV added to party Jeffrey Langley(pty:dft), Attorney Norman Donald Morrison, IV added to party Ty Murray(pty:dft), Attorney Norman Donald Morrison, IV added to party Kevin Pearce(pty:dft))(Morrison, Norman) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint | ||
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/16 4:08 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing by 6/26/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to Defendants State of California, California Department of Parks and Recreations, Kevin Pearce, Robert Cooper, Jeffrey Langley, California Highway Patrol, Ty Murray. (See document for further information). (jp) Modified on 6/16/2023 (jp) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) - optional html form
Thu 05/25 9:50 AM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Notice (Other),10 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s): for all other reasons stated in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies11 . (jre) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 05/24 5:27 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other)10 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Dismiss Case - under Category - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. (2) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. (3) Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/23 5:07 PM
Notice Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants California Department of Parks and Recreations, California Highway Patrol, Kevin Coomer, Robert Cooper, Jeffrey Langley, Ty Murray, Kevin Pearce, State of California.(Morrison, Norman) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Norman D. Morrison | ||
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/09 3:34 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 3:34 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants California Department of Parks and Recreations, California Highway Patrol, Kevin Coomer, Robert Cooper, Jeffrey Langley, Ty Murray, Kevin Pearce, State of California. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/09 3:28 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/09 3:28 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/09 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 12:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Randolph Jordan, Jordan & Associates Investments, Inc.. (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 12:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Randolph Jordan, Jordan & Associates Investments, Inc., (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/09 12:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Randolph Jordan, Jordan & Associates Investments, Inc.. (Kirakosian, Gregory) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34925641 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Randolph Jordan, Jordan & Associates Investments, Inc.. (Attorney Gregory Levon Kirakosian added to party Randolph Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Levon Kirakosian added to party Jordan & Associates Investments, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kirakosian, Gregory) |