Jan Doe v. USCIS et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fred W Slaughter |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00422 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Los Angeles Asylum Office
PO BOX 65015
Anaheim, CA 92815 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
David M. Radel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
USCIS
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services C/O Office of the Chief Counsel 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jan Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 02/05 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff. Jan Doe. Dismissal is With prejudice..(Sari, Yakup) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 05/02 9:06 AM
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application9 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the following: (1) The instant action shall be STAYED from the date of this Order until 2/28/2024; and (2) If this action has not been dismissed on or before 2/28/2024, the parties shall file a joint status report with the court on or before 3/6/2024. (jp) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Stay Case
Mon 05/01 2:18 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Los Angeles Asylum Office, David M. Radel, USCIS.(Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party David M. Radel(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party USCIS(pty:dft))(Beck, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 11:02 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office, David M. Radel, USCIS. (es) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/14 10:37 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 1:21 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff`s Attorney Jan Doe. (Sari, Yakup) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 1:20 PM
Plaintiff`s NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff`s Attorney Jan Doe, (Sari, Yakup) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Mon 03/13 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment # 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No.1 Each document should have been filed separately. (et) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 9:01 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34925231 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Yakup Sari added to party JAN DOE(pty:pla))(Sari, Yakup) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |