Ana Ventura v. Thriving Group LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01785 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 1:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Thriving Group LLC
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Ana Ventura
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Sunday, June 04, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Sun 06/04 8:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Ana Ventura. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
13
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Wed 04/12 2:19 PM
ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: After reviewing and considering Plaintiffs response to the court' s Order to Show Cause13 ,the court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act claim and related state law claims and dismisses those causes of action. As this action is now limited to Plaintiffs request for injunctive relief under the ADA, any trial in this action shall be tried by the court rather than by jury. (lc) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Response
Mon 03/27 2:42 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ana Venturato Order to Show Cause11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Mon 03/13 3:20 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc) |
|
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 03/13 2:23 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/27/2023. (tf) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/13 2:21 PM
STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/13 2:20 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 12:39 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Thriving Group LLC. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/10 12:05 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 12:05 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (car) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 2:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Ana Ventura. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 2:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/09 2:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ana Ventura. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 2:14 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34927450 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Ana Ventura(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |