Enayat Khalil et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00425 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ted H Kim
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Asylum Office
PO BOX 65015
Anaheim, CA 92815 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Radel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
United States Attorney's Office 300 N. Los Angeles Street 7th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90012 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher A. Wray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew D. Emrich
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samer Albouzieh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rashed Albuzieh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sara Albuzieh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seif Albuzieh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Enayat Khalil
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 01/09 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
Saturday, June 17, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Sat 06/17 4:29 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oil Oil counsel for Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. Adding Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr. as counsel of record for United States Department of Homeland Security et al for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants United States Department of Homeland Security et al. (Attorney Oil Oil added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Oil, Oil) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 05/15 9:25 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: The instant action is STAYED until February 12, 2024. The parties are DIRECTED to file no later than January 26, 2024, a Joint Report that advised the Court regarding the status of this matter. A Status Conference is SET for February 9, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to appear in person in Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 411 W. Fourth Street Santa Ana, CA 92701. (yl) |
|
34 | 34
stip
Stay Case
Fri 05/12 7:40 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending adjudication of plaintiff's pending 589 application filed by defendants Matthew D. Emrich, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H Kim, Los Angeles Asylum Office, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Christopher A. Wray.(Buchanan, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
33 | 33
notice
Appearance
Fri 05/12 7:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher B. Buchanan on behalf of Defendants Matthew D. Emrich, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H Kim, Los Angeles Asylum Office, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Christopher A. Wray (Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Matthew D. Emrich(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Ted H Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party David Radel(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Christopher A. Wray(pty:dft))(Buchanan, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 03/16 11:25 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sara Albuzieh, Samer Albouzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, Rashed Albuzieh, upon Defendant Christopher A. Wray served on 3/16/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
31 | 31
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 03/16 11:23 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sara Albuzieh, Samer Albouzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, Rashed Albuzieh, upon Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
30 | 30
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 03/16 11:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sara Albuzieh, Samer Albouzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, Rashed Albuzieh, upon Defendant David Radel served on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
29 | 29
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 03/16 11:13 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sara Albuzieh, Samer Albouzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, Rashed Albuzieh, upon Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office served on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
28 | 28
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 03/16 11:11 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sara Albuzieh, Samer Albouzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, Rashed Albuzieh, upon Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas served on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
27 | 27
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 03/16 11:00 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sara Albuzieh, Samer Albouzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, Rashed Albuzieh, upon Defendant Ted H Kim served on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
26 | 26
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 03/16 10:56 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sara Albuzieh, Samer Albouzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, Rashed Albuzieh, upon Defendant Ur M. Jaddou served on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
25 | 25
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 03/16 10:54 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sara Albuzieh, Samer Albouzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, Rashed Albuzieh, upon Defendant Matthew D. Emrich served on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
24 | 24
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 03/16 10:52 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sara Albuzieh, Samer Albouzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, Rashed Albuzieh, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/13 10:38 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 3:22 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant David Radel. (car) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 3:20 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant Christopher A. Wray. (car) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 3:19 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (car) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 3:18 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office. (car) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 3:17 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (car) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 3:16 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant Ted H Kim. (car) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 3:15 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant Matthew D. Emrich. (car) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 3:14 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (car) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/10 2:47 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
13 | 13
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 2:47 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 2:13 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by plaintiff Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 2:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by plaintiff Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 2:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by plaintiff Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 2:11 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by plaintiff Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 2:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by plaintiff Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 2:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by plaintiff Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 2:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by plaintiff Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 2:07 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by plaintiff Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, (Khatib, Salah) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/09 2:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Samer Albouzieh, Rashed Albuzieh, Sara Albuzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
1 | 1
40
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34927289 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Sara Albuzieh, Samer Albouzieh, Seif Albuzieh, Enayat Khalil, Rashed Albuzieh. (Attorney Salah O. Khatib added to party Samer Albouzieh (pty:pla), Attorney Salah O. Khatib added to party Rashed Albuzieh (pty:pla), Attorney Salah O. Khatib added to party Sara Albuzieh (pty:pla), Attorney Salah O. Khatib added to party Seif Albuzieh (pty:pla), Attorney Salah O. Khatib added to party Enayat Khalil (pty:pla))(Khatib, Salah) |