Shirley E. Simon v. 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Maximiliano D Couvillier |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00379 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Eighth Judicial District Court, A-23-866047-C |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 1:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
99 Cents Only Stores, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley E Simon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice Bankruptcy
Fri 04/12 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to 99 Cents Only Stores LLC by Defendant 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
notice
MDC - Clerks Notice Reassign Judge
Mon 01/08 11:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-00379-JAD-MDC . (no image attached) (LG) |
||
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
4
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Thu 12/07 4:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting19 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/22/2024. Motions due by 8/22/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Thu 12/07 2:16 PM
Third Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.. (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Mon 11/06 1:14 PM
ORDER Granting17 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Motion Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List
Fri 11/03 4:57 PM
MOTION to remove attorney Danielle Kolkoski, Esq. from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC. (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
5
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Fri 10/06 3:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting15 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/14/2024. Motions due by 4/15/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Fri 10/06 1:04 PM
Second Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.. (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Tue 09/26 9:52 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DLS) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Tue 09/26 9:51 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No.12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/14/2024 . Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2024 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/25/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Mon 09/25 11:11 AM
First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.. (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
10
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Protective Order
Mon 05/08 2:18 PM
ORDER Granting10 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/8/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Stipulated Protective Order
Mon 05/08 8:18 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.. (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Wed 04/12 2:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Tue 04/11 10:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/11/2023. ORDER STRIKING 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES. The certificate of interested parties2 filed by Defendant 99 Cents Only Stores violates newly amended FRCP 7.1, which now requires that all parties in a diversity-jurisdiction case like this one identify the citizenship of "every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party." IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the certificate of interested parties2 is STRUCK, and the defendant has five days to file a new certificate that complies with FRCP 7.1. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Fri 03/24 9:17 AM
ORDER Granting5 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/15/2023. Motions due by 1/16/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/22 2:35 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.. (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Wed 03/22 2:33 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.. (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Tue 03/14 8:52 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.. (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Fri 03/10 9:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/10/2023. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ortiz. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/25/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 03/10 9:32 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (LOE) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 3:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC DBA 99 Cents Only Stores. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition Removal
Thu 03/09 3:45 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-866047-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7231551) by 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC DBA 99 Cents Only Stores. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/19/2023. (Brandon, Lewis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |