Charles Owens v. Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01789 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:47 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Owens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felicia Livingston
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 02/14 2:17 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/26/2024. (tj) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Motion Hearing
Tue 11/07 7:12 PM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS16 held before Judge John A. Kronstadt. The motion hearing is held. The Court states its tentative views that it is inclined to grant in part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (the "Motion"). Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Motion UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (rolm) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 11/02 5:14 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING TIME FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Dkt.16 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: As indicated by the Court in its order at Dkt. 22, the Court sets the final time for Defendant's motion to be heard at 9:00 a.m. on November 6, 2023 in Courtroom 10B of the First Street Federal Courthouse.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 10/26 2:09 PM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting24 Non-Resident Attorney Prefontaine, Nicole M. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of SMITH, GAMBRELL & RUSSELL INTERNATIONAL, LLP, designating Jaworski, Myriah V. as local counsel. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/25 11:41 AM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting23 Non-Resident Attorney Floyd, Mason N. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of SMITH, GAMBRELL & RUSSELL INTERNATIONAL, LLP, designating Jaworski, Myriah V. as local counsel. (yl) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 10/24 11:59 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole M. Prefontaine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36273279)24 . The following error(s) was/were found: GSC from AZ missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lt) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 10/23 2:20 PM
First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole M. Prefontaine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36273279) filed by Defendant Smith, Gambrell & Russell International Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP. (Jaworski, Myriah) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 10/23 2:07 PM
First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mason N. Floyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36273142) filed by Defendant Smith, Gambrell & Russell International Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP. (Jaworski, Myriah) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 08/31 11:17 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT.16 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt.16 ) from September 25, 2023 to November 6, 2023 at a time to be set when the calendar for that date is finalized. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (grr) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/25 2:56 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. 18) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, the following briefing schedule for Defendants Motion to Dismiss is set: August 14, 2023: last day to file an Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss; August 21, 2023: last day to file a Reply to the Motion to Dismiss. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 08/21 7:04 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under FRCP 12(b)(6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under FRCP 12(b)(1) 16 filed by Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP. (Jaworski, Myriah) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/14 4:02 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under FRCP 12(b)(6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under FRCP 12(b)(1) 16 filed by Plaintiff Felicia Livingston. (Van Note, Laura) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/10 2:40 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under FRCP 12(b)(6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under FRCP 12(b)(1) 16 filed by Plaintiff Felicia Livingston.(Attorney Laura Grace Van Note added to party Felicia Livingston(pty:pla))(Van Note, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Errata
Mon 07/31 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion15 as a Motion to Dismiss 16 (Jaworski, Myriah) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Case Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 07/31 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under FRCP 12(b)(6) , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Jaworski, Myriah) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 07/28 1:49 PM
OPPOSITION filed by Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP. (Jaworski, Myriah) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 06/30 2:54 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Charles Owens, Felicia Livingston(Attorney Jason M Wucetich added to party Felicia Livingston(pty:pla))(Wucetich, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Redline of Complaint and FAC | ||
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/13 6:19 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT. 12) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. It is hereby ordered as follows: Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint on or before June 30,2023; and Defendants time within which to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint shall be extended up to and including July 28, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Amend/Correct
Fri 06/09 1:34 PM
STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Charles Owens.(Wucetich, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 05/12 9:27 AM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP answer now due 6/12/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP.(Jaworski, Myriah) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Mon 03/27 12:39 PM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 05/12/2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP.(Attorney Myriah Jaworski added to party Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP (pty:dft))(Jaworski, Myriah) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/13 1:08 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 10:22 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Smith, Gambrell and Russell International, LLP. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/10 10:16 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 10:16 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 4:00 PM
CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Charles Owens, (Wucetich, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/09 3:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Charles Owens. (Wucetich, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 3:54 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Charles Owens. (Wucetich, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34928975 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Charles Owens. (Attorney Jason M Wucetich added to party Charles Owens(pty:pla))(Wucetich, Jason) |