Jim Garcia v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01790 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV01957 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Jim Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 07/11 2:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), requesting dismissal of this entire action with prejudice, is hereby GRANTED. The case is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and with respect to all parties, with each party bearing their own attorney's fees and costs. RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case19 . (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (aco) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 07/06 11:11 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) Wal-Mart Associates, Inc..(Araneda, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/18 10:17 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Continue17 . Deadline for Initial Designation of Expert Witnesses 06/30/2023; Deadline for designation of Rebuttal Witnesses 7/14/2023 and Deadline to Depose Designated Expert 7/28/2023. (et) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Continue
Thu 05/11 1:51 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Expert Discovery Deadlines from May 17, 2023 to June 30, 2023 filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc..(Shin, Victoria) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Expert Discovery Deadlines | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Tue 04/18 10:21 AM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/18 1:25 PM
MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Status conference held. The Court sets the following dates: Pretrial Conference August 7, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial August 15, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (aco) |
|
14 | 14
order
Protective Order
Mon 04/17 2:40 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick re Stipulation for Protective Order.13 PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for details) (vmun) |
|
13 | 13
stip
Protective Order
Mon 04/17 12:09 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc..(Shin, Victoria) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/15 10:44 AM
Notice of Service re Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Shin, Victoria) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 03/14 2:36 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 4/17/2023 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/14 2:34 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
trial
Jury Demand
Fri 03/10 2:47 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Jim Garcia.. (Yeremenko, Vadim) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/10 10:59 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 10:58 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Thu 03/09 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. Related Case(s): none (Shin, Victoria) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/09 4:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc. identifying Walmart Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Shin, Victoria) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 4:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc., identifying Plaintiff, Jim Garcia; Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.; Defendant, Walmart Inc.. (Shin, Victoria) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/09 4:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Shin, Victoria) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Receipt No: ACACDC-34928966 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attorney Victoria Heysung Shin added to party Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Victoria Heysung Shin added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Shin, Victoria) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Victoria Shin in Support of Petition for Removal of Action, | ||
Att: 2 46 pgs State Court Complaint | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/10 11:06 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jim Garcia. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/30/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 03/10 11:09 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/8/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 03/10 11:12 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendants Walmart Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/8/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh) |