Menez v. Commissioner of Social Security
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie S Christensen |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01792 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/22 3:15 PM
ORDER FOR STIPULATION FOR THE AWARD AND PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen re Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees25 IT IS ORDERED that fees and expenses in the amount of FIVE THOUSAND FIVE HUNDRED DOLLARS AND 00/100 ($5,500.00) as authorized by 28 U.S.C. Section 2412 and costs in the amount of ZERO dollars ($0.00) under 28 U.S.C. Section 1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. (tsn) |
|
25 | 25
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Wed 11/22 11:08 AM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $5500.00. Amanda M Menez.(Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 08/23 9:56 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above-captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the Stipulation to Remand.(MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (tsn) |
|
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/23 9:51 AM
ORDER OF REMAND by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen, re Stipulation to Remand Case to US Agency22 . IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action be remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the Stipulation to Remand. (tsn) |
|
22 | 22
stip
Remand Case to US Agency
Wed 08/23 8:03 AM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency filed by defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tsai, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 08/14 6:07 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary C Tsai counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Mary Tsai as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Mary C Tsai added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tsai, Mary) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 08/14 5:58 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Jennifer Tarn is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Thu 07/27 3:38 PM
BRIEF filed by plaintiff Amanda M Menez. Plaintiff's Brief (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final
Fri 07/14 8:34 AM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final
Fri 07/07 9:02 AM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Fri 07/07 7:29 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
cs_rasgn
Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)
Thu 07/06 1:43 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-073 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Stephanie S Christensen for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 2:23-cv-01792-SSC absent further order of the Court. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/24 1:53 PM
ORDER FOR STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File13 . it is ORDERED that that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, from June 12, 2023 to August 11, 2023, for Plaintiff to serve on defendant with PLAINTIFFS BRIEF. All other dates in the Courts Scheduling Order shall be extended accordingly. (et) |
|
13 | 13
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 05/24 10:12 AM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief Amanda M Menez.(Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 05/12 9:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF AMANDA M MENEZ (mj), PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 1, | ||
Att: 6 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 2, | ||
Att: 7 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 6 | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/06 9:02 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV23-1792 MAR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 04/05 3:34 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final
Tue 03/21 9:41 AM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/15 4:25 PM
ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (et) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 03/15 12:45 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE)3 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED. (lom) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 8:19 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/09 4:20 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Amanda M Menez. (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/09 4:17 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support Amanda M Menez. (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/09 4:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amanda M Menez. (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request. (Attorney Jonathan Omar Pena added to party Amanda M Menez(pty:pla))(Pena, Jonathan) |