Karen Arrieta v. LUX Flooring, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01797 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, 23STCV02662 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
LUX Flooring, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Phyllis Cheng
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Arrieta
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 02/20 11:48 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On 2/15/2024, Defendant filed a Notice of Resolution and Stipulation to Vacate all Dates (Dkt.33 ). Upon review of the Notice, the Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for May 17, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal or response to OSC by May 10, 2024, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All scheduled dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED. The Stipulation to Vacate dates filed with the Notice of Settlement is therefore MOOT. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
stip
Vacate
Thu 02/15 4:24 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Vacate All Dates Scheduled in the Matter filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc..(Atherton, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 12/19 5:24 PM
Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc.. (Atherton, Emily) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
order
Protective Order
Tue 11/28 3:15 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth re Stipulation for Protective Order30 . NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. See Order for details. (es) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Protective Order
Tue 11/21 1:57 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc..(Atherton, Emily) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
13
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/31 11:46 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. When filing or opposing a motion for summary judgment, a party must comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 56, Local Civil Rule 56 of the Central District of California, this Order, and the Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases. Because summary judgment motions are fact-dependent, parties should prepare papers in a fashion that clearly identifies the facts material to the motion for summary judgment (e.g., generous use of tabs, tables of contents, headings, indices, etc.). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
28 | 28
20
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/31 11:43 AM
CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the Court's May 16, 2023 Scheduling and Case Management Order. If the parties wish to set additional or alternative dates, they must file a stipulation and proposed order setting forth the dates requested and demonstrating good cause. Setting additional or alternative dates may be especially appropriate in class actions, patent cases, or cases for benefits under the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 ("ERISA"). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
27 | 27
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 08/31 11:27 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement
Mon 07/31 1:09 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Phyllis Cheng: Mediation held on July 31, 2023. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Cheng, Phyllis) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Mon 07/17 6:29 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for July 31, 2023.(Cheng, Phyllis) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form
Tue 07/11 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Phyllis Cheng has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Mon 07/10 4:59 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Phyllis Cheng may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 7/31/2023 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc.(Atherton, Emily) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 05/22 2:08 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-044) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01797 WLH(JPRx). (rn) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Tue 05/16 10:46 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. If the parties have not selected and obtained the consent of a Panel Mediator within twenty-one (21) days, the ADR Program will assign one. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6-24-24. Joint status report re settlement due by: 7-1-24. (lom) |
|
20 | 20
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Tue 05/16 10:42 AM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 8/20/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates - Jury Trial | ||
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/17 9:36 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on April 28, 2023. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 04/14 3:47 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-10 days, filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc... (Atherton, Emily) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Declaration
Fri 03/17 3:17 PM
DECLARATION of Benjamin Weinstein re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc..(Ross, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Redacted) A to Declaration of Benjamin Weinstein | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Thu 03/16 4:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION12 TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Exhibit A to the Declaration of Benjamin Weinstein in Support ofDefendant's Notice of Removal, shall be removed from the public record and instead be deemed sealed. Within three days of this Order, Defendant shall file a redacted copy of Exhibit A, in place of the unredacted copy. (vdr) |
|
15 | 15
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/16 11:54 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 served on March 16,, 2023. (Ross, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Errata
Tue 03/14 5:41 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc.. correcting APPLICATION to file document Sealed Declaration of Sarah E. Ross in Support of Defendant's Application to File Document Under Seal with Exhibit A - Sealed under seal12 (Ross, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
attyseal
Sealed Declaration in Support
Tue 03/14 5:03 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Sealed Declaration of Sarah E. Ross in Support of Defendant's Application to File Document Under Seal with Exhibit A - Sealed under seal12 filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc..(Ross, Sarah) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Tue 03/14 5:00 PM
APPLICATION to file document Sealed Declaration of Sarah E. Ross in Support of Defendant's Application to File Document Under Seal with Exhibit A - Sealed under seal filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc..(Ross, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Sarah E. Ross, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 03/13 2:28 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/14/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2023 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/13 2:27 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/10 3:31 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 , Notice of Related Case(s)4 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form6 , Corporate Disclosure Statement,3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,5 served on March 10, 2023. (Ross, Sarah) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/10 11:15 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 11:14 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 6:19 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc., identifying (1) Plaintiff Karen Arrieta; (2)Scherwin Law Group Counsel for Plaintiff; (3) Defendant Lux Flooring, Inc.; and, and (4) Littler Mendelson, P.C. Counsel for Defendant. (Ross, Sarah) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Thu 03/09 6:16 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc.. Related Case(s): None (Ross, Sarah) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/09 6:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc. identifying Defendant LUX FLOORING, INC. is not a publicly traded corporation and no other person or entity owns 10 percent or more of the stock of LUX FLOORING, INC. as Corporate Parent. (Ross, Sarah) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/09 6:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc.. (Ross, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/09 6:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV02662 Receipt No: ACACDC-34930842 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc.. (Attorney Sarah Elana Ross added to party LUX Flooring, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ross, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Sarah E Ross in Support of Defendant's Notice to Federal Court of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sarah E. Ross - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Sarah E. Ross - Complaint, Notices, ADR Package etc., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Sarah E. Ross - Conformed Copy of Answer, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Sarah E. Ross - Docket, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Sarah E. Ross - Notice of Case Management Conference, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Sarah E. Ross - Notice to State Court and Adverse Praty of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Sarah E. Ross - Letter dated Dec. 19, 2022, | ||
Att: 9 Declaration of Benjamin Weinstein in Support of Defendant's Notice to Federal Court of Removal, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit A to Declaration of Benjamin Weinstein - Wage Statement | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/10 11:19 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-25, inclusive, LUX Flooring, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Karen Arrieta. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/7/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 03/10 11:21 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant LUX Flooring, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/8/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap) |